This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/11/2023 at 15:16:25 (UTC).

ANNA SHAY VS UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, INCLUDING SYNDICATE NUMBERS PEM 4000, AUW 609, HDU 382, APL 1969, AND NVA 2007, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 ANNA SHAY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, INCLUDING SYNDICATE NUMBERS PEM 4000, AUW 609, HDU 382, APL 1969, AND NVA 2007,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are CRAIG D. KARLAN and LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0731

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CRAIG D. KARLAN

LISA K SEPE-WIESENFELD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SHAY ANNA

Defendants

PIERCE JO ANN

UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON INCLUDING SYNDICATE NUMBERS PEM 4000 AUW 609 HDU 382 APL 1969 AND NVA 2007

HUB INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BOUSTANI JONATHAN

SCHACK DAVID P.

O'HANLON MATTHEW

Defendant Attorneys

DOLAN ROBERT TRACEY

TARKIAN ALEX

 

Court Documents

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT EXHS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS HUB INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE SERVICES AND JO ANN PIERCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

8/30/2023: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT EXHS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS HUB INTERNATIONAL INSURANCE SERVICES AND JO ANN PIERCE MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Motion for Summary Adjudication

8/30/2023: Motion for Summary Adjudication

Separate Statement

8/30/2023: Separate Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT THOSE INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

8/17/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANT THOSE INTERESTED UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYD'S OF LONDON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

8/16/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS PLAINTIFF ANNA SHAYS EX PARTE APPLICATIO...)

6/1/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS PLAINTIFF ANNA SHAYS EX PARTE APPLICATIO...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS PLAINTIFF ANNA SHAYS EX PARTE APPLICATIO...) OF 06/01/2023

6/1/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (EX-PARTE PROCEEDINGS PLAINTIFF ANNA SHAYS EX PARTE APPLICATIO...) OF 06/01/2023

Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF ANNA SHAYS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND, TO

5/31/2023: Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF ANNA SHAYS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND, TO

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/31/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING RE APPLICATION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF ANNA SHAYS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDONS MO

5/31/2023: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING NOTICE OF LODGING RE APPLICATION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF ANNA SHAYS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDONS MO

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFF ANNA SHAYS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND, TO THE EXTENT NE

5/30/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION PLAINTIFF ANNA SHAYS EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANT UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND, TO THE EXTENT NE

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

5/30/2023: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

3/13/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND CERTAIN ASSOCIATED DATES; ORDER THEREON

3/7/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE, HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND CERTAIN ASSOCIATED DATES; ORDER THEREON

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/27/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); HEARING ON MOTION TO COM...)

2/15/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); HEARING ON MOTION TO COM...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); HEARING ON MOTION TO COM...) OF 02/15/2023

2/15/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC); HEARING ON MOTION TO COM...) OF 02/15/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

1/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

117 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

01/22/2024

Hearing01/22/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2024

Hearing01/09/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/16/2023

Hearing11/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department N at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketMotion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: HUB International Insurance Services, Inc. (Defendant); Jo Ann Pierce (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketAffidavit Exhs in Support of Defendants HUB International Insurance Services and Jo Ann Pierce Motion for Summary Adjudication; Filed by: HUB International Insurance Services, Inc. (Defendant); Jo Ann Pierce (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by: HUB International Insurance Services, Inc. (Defendant); Jo Ann Pierce (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 11/16/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment (Filed by Defendant on 11/02/2022)/ Notice of Moving Party on Motion for Summary Judgment's Withdrawal of the Motion against Plaintiff/ scheduled for 09/08/2023 at 09:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 08/17/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2023

DocketNotice of Withdrawal of Defendant Those Interested Underwriters at Lloyd's of London's Motion for Summary Judgment; Filed by: UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, INCLUDING SYNDICATE NUMBERS PEM 4000, AUW 609, HDU 382, APL 1969, and NVA 2007 (Defendant); As to: Anna Shay (Plaintiff); UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, INCLUDING SYNDICATE NUMBERS PEM 4000, AUW 609, HDU 382, APL 1969, and NVA 2007 (Defendant); HUB International Insurance Services, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketNotice NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Filed by: Anna Shay (Plaintiff); As to: UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, INCLUDING SYNDICATE NUMBERS PEM 4000, AUW 609, HDU 382, APL 1969, and NVA 2007 (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
184 More Docket Entries
06/09/2020

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Anna Shay (Plaintiff); As to: UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, INCLUDING SYNDICATE NUMBERS PEM 4000, AUW 609, HDU 382, APL 1969, and NVA 2007 (Defendant); Service Date: 06/02/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2020

DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Anna Shay (Plaintiff); As to: HUB International Insurance Services, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 05/29/2020; Service Cost Waived: No

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/29/2020

DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Anna Shay (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2020

DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 11/23/2020 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department N

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2020

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/27/2020

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Craig D. Karlan in Department N Santa Monica Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Anna Shay (Plaintiff); As to: UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, INCLUDING SYNDICATE NUMBERS PEM 4000, AUW 609, HDU 382, APL 1969, and NVA 2007 (Defendant); HUB International Insurance Services, Inc. (Defendant); Jo Ann Pierce (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anna Shay (Plaintiff); As to: UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, INCLUDING SYNDICATE NUMBERS PEM 4000, AUW 609, HDU 382, APL 1969, and NVA 2007 (Defendant); HUB International Insurance Services, Inc. (Defendant); Jo Ann Pierce (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anna Shay (Plaintiff); As to: UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS, LONDON, INCLUDING SYNDICATE NUMBERS PEM 4000, AUW 609, HDU 382, APL 1969, and NVA 2007 (Defendant); HUB International Insurance Services, Inc. (Defendant); Jo Ann Pierce (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less