This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2021 at 20:10:39 (UTC).

ANNA SALMAN VS RITE AID

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 ANNA SALMAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against RITE AID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5225

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALMAN ANNA

Defendant

RITE AID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISNER ALEXANDER C.

Defendant Attorney

SHAYNE JOSHUA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/25/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

2/25/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

PI General Order

12/31/2020: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

12/31/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2023
  • Hearing11/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • Hearing05/25/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • Hearing05/11/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Thrifty Payless, Inc. Erroneously Sued As RITE AID (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANNA SALMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ANNA SALMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ANNA SALMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ANNA SALMAN (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer EISNER ALEXANDER C