This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 02:39:36 (UTC).

ANNA PAPIAN VS SONIC SANTA MONICA M INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 ANNA PAPIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SONIC SANTA MONICA M INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4338

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAPIAN ANNA

Defendants

MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC

BERKLEY INSURANCE COMPANY

SONIC SANTA MONICA M INC. DBA W.I. SIMONSON MERCEDES-BENZ

SONIC SANTA MONICA M INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERMAN DAVID L.

Defendant Attorneys

MASHBURN MICHAEL C.

ROBINETT TIMOTHY D.

TAHSILDOOST SOHEYL

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

6/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

4/23/2021: Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement)

Notice of Settlement

4/23/2021: Notice of Settlement

Substitution of Attorney

2/25/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

1/7/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

12/21/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

11/17/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY

Informal Discovery Conference

10/6/2020: Informal Discovery Conference

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

10/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Case Management Statement

8/7/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

7/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2020

7/31/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 07/31/2020

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/20/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

7/20/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

7/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC

7/28/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - NOTICE OF POSTING OF JURY FEES MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

5/29/2020: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Personal Service

5/29/2020: Proof of Personal Service

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Anna Papian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Anna Papian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 56; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 56; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 56; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Informal Discovery Conference); Filed by Anna Papian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER ? CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATION ONLY); Filed by Anna Papian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anna Papian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st); Filed by Anna Papian (Plaintiff); Anna Papian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by Anna Papian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anna Papian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anna Papian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Venue); Filed by Anna Papian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anna Papian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SONIC SANTA MONICA M INC. DBA W I SIMONSON is a litigant

Latest cases where BERKELY INSURANCE COMPANY A DELAWARE is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCEDES-BENZ USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERMAN DAVID L.