Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/24/2021 at 23:50:26 (UTC).

ANNA MARIE PIERSIMONI, ET AL. VS KA-LEUNG CHAN

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 ANNA MARIE PIERSIMONI filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against KA-LEUNG CHAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9435

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BROOKS NINA

PIERSIMONI ANNA MARIE

BOOKS MARC

ANNA MARIE PIERSIMONI AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO DECEDENT LARRY DAVID BROOKS

Defendant

CHAN KA-LEUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHEA ADAM

PANISH BRIAN J

GLASSMAN ROBERT SAMUEL ESQ.

GLASSMAN ROBERT

PANISH BRIAN JOSEPH ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

BARATTA JAMES M

BARATTA JAMES MARK ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

6/15/2021: Notice of Related Case

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/27/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH OR LIMIT PLAINTIFF ANNA MARIE PIERSIMONIS DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ARCHITECTURE INSTITUTE

5/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH OR LIMIT PLAINTIFF ANNA MARIE PIERSIMONIS DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ARCHITECTURE INSTITUTE

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF STAY / DEFENDANT KA-LEUNG C...) OF 03/17/2021

3/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF STAY / DEFENDANT KA-LEUNG C...) OF 03/17/2021

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF STAY / DEFENDANT KA-LEUNG C...)

3/17/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF STAY / DEFENDANT KA-LEUNG C...)

Notice - NOTICE RE ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY AS TO DEFENDANT KA-LEUNG CHAN

10/14/2020: Notice - NOTICE RE ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY AS TO DEFENDANT KA-LEUNG CHAN

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY DISCOVERY AS TO DEFENDANT'S PENDING CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SHORTEN TIME TO BE HEARD ON A MOTION TO STAY AND TO STAY DISCOVE

10/14/2020: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY DISCOVERY AS TO DEFENDANT'S PENDING CRIMINAL PROCEEDINGS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO SHORTEN TIME TO BE HEARD ON A MOTION TO STAY AND TO STAY DISCOVE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY DISCOVERY...)

10/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO STAY DISCOVERY...)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

6/12/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

6/12/2020: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

6/1/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

5/21/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST

Complaint

5/21/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/21/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/21/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/27/2020: Amended Complaint - 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

5/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

5/28/2020: PI General Order

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • Hearing05/18/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Hearing11/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • Hearing11/04/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • Hearing08/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Status of Stay / Defendant Ka-Leung Chan's Criminal Proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Quash (Subpoena of Plaintiff) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Anna Marie Piersimoni (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO QUASH OR LIMIT PLAINTIFF ANNA MARIE PIERSIMONI?S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ARCHITECTURE INSTITUTE); Filed by Ka-Leung Chan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketMotion to Quash (TO QUASH OR LIMIT PLAINTIFF ANNA MARIE PIERSIMONI'S DEPOSITION SUBPOENA TO NON-PARTY SCI-ARC; REQUEST FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,940;); Filed by Ka-Leung Chan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Anna Marie Piersimoni (Plaintiff); Nina Brooks (Plaintiff); Marc Books (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Status of Stay / Defendant Ka-Leung Chan's Criminal Proceedings) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anna Marie Piersimoni (Plaintiff); Nina Brooks (Plaintiff); Marc Books (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on 1st Amended Complaint); Filed by Anna Marie Piersimoni (Plaintiff); Nina Brooks (Plaintiff); Marc Books (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docket1st Amended Complaint; Filed by Anna Marie Piersimoni (Plaintiff); Anna Marie Piersimoni (Plaintiff); ANNA MARIE PIERSIMONI, as successor in interest to Decedent Larry David Brooks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anna Marie Piersimoni (Plaintiff); ANNA MARIE PIERSIMONI, as successor in interest to Decedent Larry David Brooks (Plaintiff); Nina Brooks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anna Marie Piersimoni (Plaintiff); ANNA MARIE PIERSIMONI, as successor in interest to Decedent Larry David Brooks (Plaintiff); Nina Brooks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anna Marie Piersimoni (Plaintiff); ANNA MARIE PIERSIMONI, as successor in interest to Decedent Larry David Brooks (Plaintiff); Nina Brooks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST); Filed by Anna Marie Piersimoni (Plaintiff); ANNA MARIE PIERSIMONI, as successor in interest to Decedent Larry David Brooks (Plaintiff); Nina Brooks (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLASSMAN ROBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLASSMAN ROBERT SAMUEL ESQ.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHEA ADAM

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PANISH BRIAN JOSEPH