This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/15/2023 at 17:48:07 (UTC).

ANNA MARIE ONAINDIA VS CITY OF SANTA MONICA

Case Summary

On 08/17/2021 ANNA MARIE ONAINDIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF SANTA MONICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0384

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ONAINDIA ANNA MARIE

1022 S. LA CIENEGA MANAGER LLC

Defendant

CITY OF SANTA MONICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FLEITMAN JEFFREY P

ROWEN ERIC V.

COLE TERRY J

Defendant Attorneys

DURYEA KAREN

FOX DANA A

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/17/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

2/16/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

10/14/2021: Answer

PI General Order

9/10/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Related Case

8/26/2021: Notice of Related Case

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

10/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Association of Attorney

1/12/2023: Association of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT CITY OF SANTA MONICA'S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

3/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT CITY OF SANTA MONICA'S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL

Association of Attorney

3/7/2023: Association of Attorney

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2024
  • Hearing08/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2023
  • Hearing08/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2023
  • Hearing07/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • DocketNotice Defendant City of Santa Monica's Notice of Association of Counsel; Filed by: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant); As to: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff); 1022 S. La Cienega Manager, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER; Signed and Filed by: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 07/28/2023 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 08/11/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Status Date changed from 08/26/2021 to 08/26/2021; Filed By: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff),1022 S. La Cienega Manager, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Reviewed; Result Date: 08/30/2021; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less