*******0384
08/17/2021
Pending - Other Pending
Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Los Angeles, California
ONAINDIA ANNA MARIE
1022 S. LA CIENEGA MANAGER LLC
CITY OF SANTA MONICA
FLEITMAN JEFFREY P
ROWEN ERIC V.
COLE TERRY J
DURYEA KAREN
FOX DANA A
8/17/2021: Complaint
8/17/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
8/17/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet
8/17/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
2/16/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
10/14/2021: Answer
9/10/2021: PI General Order
9/10/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES
8/26/2021: Notice of Related Case
10/18/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE; [PROPOSED] ORDER
12/15/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
1/12/2023: Association of Attorney
3/2/2023: Notice - NOTICE DEFENDANT CITY OF SANTA MONICA'S NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL
3/7/2023: Association of Attorney
5/23/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES AND PROPOSED ORDER
Hearing08/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal
[-] Read LessHearing02/05/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial
[-] Read LessHearing01/22/2024 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES AND PROPOSED ORDER: Status Date changed from 05/23/2023 to 05/23/2023 ; As To Parties changed from Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff) to Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketStipulation and Order STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES AND PROPOSED ORDER; Signed and Filed by: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant); As to: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketPursuant to written stipulation, Final Status Conference scheduled for 07/28/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 01/22/2024 10:00 AM
[-] Read LessDocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/11/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 02/05/2024 08:30 AM
[-] Read LessDocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice Defendant City of Santa Monica's Notice of Association of Counsel; Filed by: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant); As to: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Notice of Related Case: Status Date changed from 08/26/2021 to 08/26/2021; Filed By: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff),1022 S. La Cienega Manager, LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Reviewed; Result Date: 08/30/2021; As To Parties: removed
[-] Read LessDocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 01/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
[-] Read LessDocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 08/13/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 27
[-] Read LessDocketComplaint; Filed by: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anna Marie Onaindia (Plaintiff); As to: CITY OF SANTA MONICA (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. William A. Crowfoot in Department 27 Spring Street Courthouse
[-] Read Less