This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/08/2020 at 19:19:52 (UTC).

ANNA KARAPETYAN VS VARTANUSH VARTANI

Case Summary

On 06/01/2018 ANNA KARAPETYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against VARTANUSH VARTANI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE and MARK A. BORENSTEIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8700

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

KARAPETYAN ANNA

Defendants and Respondents

VARTANI VARTANUSH

DOES 1 THROUGH 10 INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

AKARAGIAN ARMEN ESQ.

AKARAGIAN ARMEN KEVORK ESQ.

Defendant Attorneys

ETMEKJIAN GARBIS

ETMEKJIAN GARBIS DICKRAN N ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Ruling

9/1/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (1.- HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT'S ANSWER ...)

8/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (1.- HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT'S ANSWER ...)

Substitution of Attorney

7/23/2020: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF: (1) HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT'S ANSWER FOR HER FAILURE TO OBEY COURT'S ORDER COMPELLING HER TO APPEAR AND TESTIFY AT DEPOS

5/1/2020: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF: (1) HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANT'S ANSWER FOR HER FAILURE TO OBEY COURT'S ORDER COMPELLING HER TO APPEAR AND TESTIFY AT DEPOS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE 06/02/2020 HEARING ON MOT...)

4/20/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE 06/02/2020 HEARING ON MOT...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE 06/02/2020 HEARING ON MOT...) OF 04/20/2020

4/20/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: CONTINUANCE OF THE 06/02/2020 HEARING ON MOT...) OF 04/20/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING THE 04/02/2020 HEARING OF DEFENDANT'S ...)

3/23/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER CONTINUING THE 04/02/2020 HEARING OF DEFENDANT'S ...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING THE 04/02/2020 HEARING OF DEFENDANT'S ...) OF 03/23/2020

3/23/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER CONTINUING THE 04/02/2020 HEARING OF DEFENDANT'S ...) OF 03/23/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT VARTANUSH VA...)

2/4/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING DEFENDANT VARTANUSH VA...)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

1/3/2020: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/15/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

11/15/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/31/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/13/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

CoverSheet -

6/1/2018: CoverSheet -

Civil Case Cover Sheet -

6/1/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet -

Summons -

6/1/2018: Summons -

Complaint -

6/1/2018: Complaint -

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • Hearing10/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Hearing09/28/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 29 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Anna Karapetyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (Striking Defendant's Answer for Her Failure to Obey This Court's Order Compelling Her To Appear and Testify at Deposition and Produce Documents At Deposition) - Held - Motion Denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (1.- Hearing on Motion for Order Striking Defendant's Answer ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Vartanush Vartani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Order (Striking Defendant's Answer for Her Failure to Obey This Court's Order Compelling Her To Appear and Testify at Deposition and Produce Documents At Deposition) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 29, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Mark A. Borenstein, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • Docket[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Personal Injury Courts Only (Central District); Filed by Anna Karapetyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Anna Karapetyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Vartanush Vartani (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Anna Karapetyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anna Karapetyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC708700    Hearing Date: February 04, 2020    Dept: 29

Karapetyan v. Vartani

Plaintiff’s Motion for Order Compelling, Defendant Vartanush Vartani to Appear and Testify at his Deposition and to Produce Documents at Deposition is GRANTED.

A party may move to compel a party’s deposition when the party fails to appear for the deposition or fails to produce for inspection any document described in the deposition notice. Cal. Code Civ. Proc. § 2025.450.

On 10/17/19, Plaintiff served Defendant’s counsel with Notices of Taking Deposition and Request for Production of Documents. Exhibit 1. There is no evidence Defendant objected to the notices. Defendant did not appear at his deposition scheduled for 11/1/19. Exhibit 2.

On 11/6/19, Plaintiff sent a letter to meet and confer with defense counsel about Defendant’s non-appearance as required by statute. Exhibit 3. Defense counsel responded that he would not appear without a court order. Declaration of Armen Akaragian, ¶ 9.  Defendant provides no valid excuse for the failure to appear.

Defendant Vartanush Vartani is ordered to appear for deposition and produce documents without objection within 20 days on a date duly noticed by Plaintiff.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.