This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/07/2022 at 21:33:24 (UTC).

ANNA GAO, ET AL. VS CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 ANNA GAO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2168

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GAO ANNA

LUO INDIVIDUALS WEIYAO

Defendants

CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES

ENZIE EMIL D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARCHIAN BENJAMIN

Defendant Attorney

MEYER STEVEN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/31/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/31/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Demand for Jury Trial

8/31/2021: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/31/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/31/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

9/30/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

9/30/2021: PI General Order

Answer

3/14/2022: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/14/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/3/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/24/2022: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2024
  • Hearing08/27/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • Hearing02/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • Hearing02/14/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES (Defendant); EMIL D. ENZIE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by CLEAN HARBORS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES (Defendant); EMIL D. ENZIE (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ANNA GAO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANNA GAO (Plaintiff); WEIYAO LUO, individuals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ANNA GAO (Plaintiff); WEIYAO LUO, individuals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ANNA GAO (Plaintiff); WEIYAO LUO, individuals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ANNA GAO (Plaintiff); WEIYAO LUO, individuals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by ANNA GAO (Plaintiff); WEIYAO LUO, individuals (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Corporation is a litigant