Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2019 at 01:02:00 (UTC).

ANNA CORTEZ ET AL VS SHARI JEAN SANDERSON

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 ANNA CORTEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SHARI JEAN SANDERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0248

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

CORTE ANNA

Defendants and Respondents

ANDERSON SHARI JEAN

DOES 1 TO 20

Minor

CORTEZ NIKOLAI

Guardian Ad Litem

CORTEZ ANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Minor, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BLAU HOWARD LAW OFFICES OF

Defendant Attorney

FITZHUGH TIMOTHY B. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

2/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

3/2/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

3/2/2018: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

3/2/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

Unknown

3/2/2018: Unknown

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/17/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

EX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

11/20/2017: EX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

SUMMONS

12/5/2017: SUMMONS

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/18/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • CIVIL DEPOSIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Notice; Filed by SHARI JEAN ANDERSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by SHARI JEAN ANDERSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Receipt; Filed by SHARI JEAN ANDERSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • Answer; Filed by SHARI JEAN ANDERSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by ANNA CORTE (Plaintiff); NIKOLAI CORTEZ (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Summons Issued; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM-CIVIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Application ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by ANNA CORTE (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZHUGH TIMOTHY