Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 13:18:55 (UTC).

ANN TURKEL VS CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 04/04/2017 ANN TURKEL filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6715

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

TURKEL ANN

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

RING LAURENCE ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

MOROVATI CHRISTINA Y. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

3/16/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

4/4/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

4/4/2017: SUMMONS

SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

5/2/2017: SUMMONS ON FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT?PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

5/2/2017: COMPLAINT?PERSONAL INJURY, PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH

ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

8/18/2017: ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2018
  • Request and Entry of Dismissal (WITH PREJUDICE, ENTIRE ACTION; ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • Answer to First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Defendant/Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • Summons Filed; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • First Amended Complaint; Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN TOWERS HOMEOWNER'S ASSOCIATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOROVATI CHRISTINA Y. ESQUIRE