This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2023 at 14:04:52 (UTC).

ANN LECHTHOLZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS JORDEN CHANZE CLARK

Case Summary

On 10/28/2022 ANN LECHTHOLZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JORDEN CHANZE CLARK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1794

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LECHTHOLZ AN INDIVIDUAL ANN

Defendant

CLARK JORDEN CHANZE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FINE EDWARD S.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/28/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/28/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/1/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/24/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department U

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Valerie Salkin in Department U Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ANN LECHTHOLZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: JORDEN CHANZE CLARK (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANN LECHTHOLZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: JORDEN CHANZE CLARK (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANN LECHTHOLZ, AN INDIVIDUAL (Plaintiff); As to: JORDEN CHANZE CLARK (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less