This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/28/2020 at 09:46:46 (UTC).

ANIXTER, INC. VS AMERICAN HOME ALARMS, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 ANIXTER, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN HOME ALARMS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8634

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANIXTER INC.

TRI-ED DISTRIBUTION

Defendants

AMERICAN HOME ALARMS INC.

NGUYEN JEAN-PIERRE AN INDIVIDUAL

NGUYEN JEAN-PIERRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ALAN L. BRODKIN & ASSOCIATES

BRODKIN ALAN LEE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)

12/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

12/19/2019: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)

9/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATI...)

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

9/17/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

5/28/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Summons

7/13/2018: Summons

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COMPLAINT FILED-SUMMONS ISSUED

7/13/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COMPLAINT FILED-SUMMONS ISSUED

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/13/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE OF OSC

7/13/2018: Notice - NOTICE OF OSC

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/13/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/13/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

8/6/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

1/11/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination

Legacy Document -

8/6/2018: Legacy Document -

Legacy Document -

9/25/2018: Legacy Document -

Legacy Document -

9/25/2018: Legacy Document -

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment -

9/25/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment -

Legacy Document -

9/25/2018: Legacy Document -

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by ANIXTER, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (and Enforcement of Judgment as to Judgment Debtor Jean-Pierre Nguyen filed on behalf of Plaintiff Anixter, Inc.) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (and Enforcement of Judgment as to Judgment Debtor Jean-Pierre Nguyen, an individual) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by TRI-ED DISTRIBUTION (Plaintiff); ANIXTER, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by ANIXTER, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination (And Enforcement of Judgment as to Judgment Debtor Jean-Pierre Nguyen filed on behalf of plaintiff Anixter, Inc.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by TRI-ED DISTRIBUTION (Plaintiff); ANIXTER, INC. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNotice (of OSC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketSummons Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNotice

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketSummons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of OSC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRI-ED DISTRIBUTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Anixter Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN HOME ALARMS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRODKIN ALAN