Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2021 at 15:22:57 (UTC).

ANIXTER INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION VS JOHN B. RUDY COMPANY, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 ANIXTER INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against JOHN B RUDY COMPANY, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6763

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANIXTER INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendants

JOHN B. RUDY COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CHUN RONALD

RUDY JOHN A.

CHUN BARBARA J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCHWARTZ ROBERT

SCHWARTZ ROBERT D.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/7/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/9/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/29/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/2/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/12/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/4/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/4/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

5/4/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

5/4/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/6/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • Hearing09/01/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Anixter Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Anixter Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Anixter Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Anixter Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Anixter Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Anixter Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anixter Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anixter Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anixter Inc., a Delaware corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JOHN B. RUDY COMPANY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Anixter Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARTZ ROBERT

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHWARTZ , ROBERT D