This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/20/2023 at 19:53:30 (UTC).

ANITA TERESA PILE TERRY, ET AL. VS MAGNOLIA GARDENS CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/23/2022 ANITA TERESA PILE TERRY, filed a Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse lawsuit against MAGNOLIA GARDENS CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0007

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Elder/Dependant Adult Abuse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TERRY ANITA TERESA PILE

TERRY SABU

TERRY ZURI KINSHASA MARIA

TERRY JOHN PETER RAYMOND

Defendants

CASITAS CARE CENTER

DEANCO HEALTHCARE LLC

KF CASITAS LLC

KF FACILITIES OPERATIONS LLC

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING LLC

KINDRED HOSPITAL - LOS ANGELES

LIBBY CARE CENTER INC.

MAGNOLIA GARDENS CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL

MAGNOLIA GARDENS CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL INC.

MISSION COMMUNITY HOSPITAL

PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM-SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA

PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER

TERRY PAUL PETER RAYMOND

THC - ORANGE COUNTY LLC

Not Classified By Court

THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOHNSON DANIEL

Defendant Attorneys

LY ANDREW

COONEY JENNIFER

LOWELL REBECCA BLACKSTONE

SCHAEFFER JAMES CRAIG

TREDWAY DAVID RUSH

HESTER CECILLE LOUISE

ALVARADO LESVIA MARIETTA

WHITMAN ANDREW KENTFIELD

Not Classified By Court Attorney

REBACK ROBERT C

 

Court Documents

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

9/8/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

9/6/2023: Unknown - REQUEST FOR REFUND / ORDER (EFILING)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

8/31/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF TRIAL ATTORNEY

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

8/31/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

8/28/2023: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

8/28/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

8/16/2023: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

8/16/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Notice of Ruling

8/8/2023: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID R. TREDWAY, ESQ. PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41(A)(2) AND 435.5(A)(2) RE MEET AND CONFER

8/8/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DAVID R. TREDWAY, ESQ. PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 430.41(A)(2) AND 435.5(A)(2) RE MEET AND CONFER

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

7/31/2023: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

7/31/2023: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Declaration - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41(A)(2) AND 435.5(A)(2)

7/28/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CCP 430.41(A)(2) AND 435.5(A)(2)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

7/28/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Answer

7/27/2023: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

7/20/2023: Demand for Jury Trial

Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING DESIGNATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

7/20/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION REGARDING DESIGNATION OF TRIAL COUNSEL

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/20/2023: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2023
  • Hearing11/08/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2023
  • Hearing10/27/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2023
  • Hearing10/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2023
  • Hearing10/25/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2023
  • Hearing10/20/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Refund / Order (eFiling): Filed By: The Regents of the University of California (Doe 1) (Non-Party); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 09/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10): As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- The Regents of the University of California (Doe 1) erroneously sued as Regents University of California Health Sciences & Services (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Regents University of California Health Sciences & Services (DOE 1) to The Regents of the University of California (Doe 1) erroneously sued as Regents University of California Health Sciences & Services

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by: The Regents of the University of California (Doe 1) (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- The Regents of the University of California (Non-Party): Organization Name changed from The Regents of the University of California (Doe 1) to The Regents of the University of California

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 04/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 38

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Anita Teresa Pile Terry (Plaintiff); Paul Peter Raymond Terry (Plaintiff); Zuri Kinshasa Maria Terry, (Plaintiff); Sabu Terry (Plaintiff); Zuri Kinshasa Maria Terry (Plaintiff); As to: Magnolia Gardens Convalescent Hospital (Defendant); Magnolia Gardens Convalescent Hospital, Inc. (Defendant); Libby Care Center, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anita Teresa Pile Terry (Plaintiff); Paul Peter Raymond Terry (Plaintiff); Zuri Kinshasa Maria Terry, (Plaintiff); Sabu Terry (Plaintiff); Zuri Kinshasa Maria Terry (Plaintiff); As to: Magnolia Gardens Convalescent Hospital (Defendant); Magnolia Gardens Convalescent Hospital, Inc. (Defendant); Libby Care Center, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anita Teresa Pile Terry (Plaintiff); Paul Peter Raymond Terry (Plaintiff); Zuri Kinshasa Maria Terry, (Plaintiff); Sabu Terry (Plaintiff); Zuri Kinshasa Maria Terry (Plaintiff); As to: Magnolia Gardens Convalescent Hospital (Defendant); Magnolia Gardens Convalescent Hospital, Inc. (Defendant); Libby Care Center, Inc. (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maureen Duffy-Lewis in Department 38 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less