This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/10/2023 at 07:25:08 (UTC).

ANITA OGLETREE, VS WESTSIDE HOTEL VENTURE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/14/2022 ANITA OGLETREE, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against WESTSIDE HOTEL VENTURE, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8955

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OGLETREE ANITA

Defendant

WESTSIDE HOTEL VENTURE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL SCOTT J

Defendant Attorney

STILLMAN PHILIP H.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/14/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Summons on Complaint

12/14/2022: Summons Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/14/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

12/14/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

12/14/2022: First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing First Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing

Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

12/14/2022: Alternate Dispute Resolution Packet

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/19/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/19/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/10/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

4/3/2023: Case Management Statement

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/3/2023: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Case Management Statement

4/12/2023: Case Management Statement

Answer

4/12/2023: Answer

Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

4/18/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)

Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment Package)

6/20/2023: Minute Order Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment Package)

Notice of Trial Notice of Trial AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

6/20/2023: Notice of Trial Notice of Trial AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2025

Hearing10/13/2025 at 09:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2025

Hearing10/09/2025 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/09/2025 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketJury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2025 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketNotice of Trial AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE; Filed by: Anita Ogletree, (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketUpdated -- Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment Package): Status Date changed from 06/20/2023 to 06/20/2023 ; Name Extension changed from (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment Package) to (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment Package) ; As To Parties:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketOn the Complaint filed by Anita Ogletree, on 12/14/2022, Default entered on 04/03/2023, Vacated - .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment Package)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Default Judgment Package scheduled for 06/20/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 20 updated: Result Date to 06/20/2023; Result Type to Held

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/18/2023

DocketUpdated -- Answer: As To Parties changed from Anita Ogletree, (Plaintiff) to Anita Ogletree, (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
12/19/2022

DocketUpdated -- Westside Hotel Venture, LLC (Defendant): Organization Name changed from Westside Hotel Venture, LLC, a California limited liability company to Westside Hotel Venture, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2022

DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/15/2022

DocketCase assigned to Hon. Kevin C. Brazile in Department 20 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketComplaint; Filed by: Anita Ogletree, (Plaintiff); As to: Westside Hotel Venture, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anita Ogletree, (Plaintiff); As to: Westside Hotel Venture, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anita Ogletree, (Plaintiff); As to: Westside Hotel Venture, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/14/2022

DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less