This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/14/2023 at 20:56:23 (UTC).

ANITA NEUMANN, ET AL. VS SINA AKHTARZAD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 ANITA NEUMANN, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SINA AKHTARZAD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY W. ALARCON and DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7885

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY W. ALARCON

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GEMSAG ON MELROSE

NEUMANN ANITA

GEMSAG MEDICAL

HIDALGO NATALIE

BUENAMED NURSING

SPAVERGNUGEN CITY LIFE REHABILITATION PILATES & FITNESS

Defendants

AKHTARZAD SINA

AKHTARZAD MICHAEL AKA MICHAEL STARSON

BRENNAN WILLIAM

KALOLOGIE SPA DESTINATIONS LLC

K360 BRENTWOOD LLC

K360 STUDIO CITY LLC

K360 MELROSE MANAGEMENT LLC

BRENNAN TRACY

11906 SAN VICENTE LLC

K360 T.O. MANAGEMENT LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROEMER GLEN ROBERT

Defendant Attorneys

SINGER IAN J

SIMS NANCY THIEN-HA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

5/22/2019: Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE TELEPHONIC)

11/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CONFERENCE TELEPHONIC)

Request for Dismissal

2/18/2020: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

2/19/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: THE MOVING PAPERS FROM 12/4/19...)

12/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: THE MOVING PAPERS FROM 12/4/19...)

Notice of Settlement

1/8/2020: Notice of Settlement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTIONS SETTING CONFERENCE)

1/10/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING - OTHER STATUS CONFERENCE AND MOTIONS SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF RESETTING OF HEARING ON KALOLOGIE SPA'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

1/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF RESETTING OF HEARING ON KALOLOGIE SPA'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

1/3/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

12/10/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/12/2019: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10) TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice

12/12/2019: Request for Judicial Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER STAYING DISCOVERY; HEARING ON DEMUR...)

12/4/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION - OTHER STAYING DISCOVERY; HEARING ON DEMUR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: THE MOVING PAPERS FROM 12/4/19...)

12/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: THE MOVING PAPERS FROM 12/4/19...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION/ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

11/12/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION/ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS

11/12/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS

Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION TO 'NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS'

11/13/2019: Objection - OBJECTION OBJECTION TO 'NOTICE OF PENDING MOTIONS'

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/19/2020 at 09:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 96 updated: Result Date to 02/19/2020; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Anita Neumann, et al. on 10/08/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Anita Neumann, Buenamed Nursing, Gemsag Medical, Gemsag On Melrose, Natalie Hidalgo, and Spavergnugen, City Life Rehabilitation, Pilates & Fitness as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Anita Neumann (Plaintiff); Natalie Hidalgo (Plaintiff); Gemsag Medical (Plaintiff); Gemsag On Melrose (Plaintiff); Spavergnugen, City Life Rehabilitation, Pilates & Fitness (Plaintiff); Buenamed Nursing (Plaintiff); As to: Sina Akhtarzad (Defendant); Michael Akhtarzad (Defendant); William Brennan (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 10/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 01/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Motion to Quash for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction scheduled for 10/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 01/15/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 02/19/2020 at 09:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 96

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing - Other Status Conference and Motions Setting Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketHearing - Other Status Conference and Motions Setting Conference scheduled for 01/10/2020 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 96 updated: Result Date to 01/10/2020; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Hearing on Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum scheduled for 01/27/2020 at 09:15 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 96 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 01/10/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
129 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint; Proposed Order: Filed By: William Brennan (Defendant),Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC (Defendant); Result: Granted; Result Date: 07/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order Extending Time to Respond to Complaint; Proposed Order; Filed by: William Brennan (Defendant); Kalologie Spa Destinations LLC (Defendant); As to: Anita Neumann (Plaintiff); Natalie Hidalgo (Plaintiff); Gemsag Medical (Plaintiff) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 08/26/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 32

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel S. Murphy in Department 32 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Anita Neumann (Plaintiff); Natalie Hidalgo (Plaintiff); Gemsag Medical (Plaintiff); Gemsag On Melrose (Plaintiff); Spavergnugen (Plaintiff); City Life Rehabilitation, Pilates & Fitness Spa (Plaintiff); As to: Sina Akhtarzad (Defendant); Michael Akhtarzad (Defendant); William Brennan (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anita Neumann (Plaintiff); Natalie Hidalgo (Plaintiff); Gemsag Medical (Plaintiff); Gemsag On Melrose (Plaintiff); Spavergnugen (Plaintiff); City Life Rehabilitation, Pilates & Fitness Spa (Plaintiff); As to: Sina Akhtarzad (Defendant); Michael Akhtarzad (Defendant); William Brennan (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Anita Neumann (Plaintiff); Natalie Hidalgo (Plaintiff); Gemsag Medical (Plaintiff); Gemsag On Melrose (Plaintiff); Spavergnugen (Plaintiff); City Life Rehabilitation, Pilates & Fitness Spa (Plaintiff); As to: Sina Akhtarzad (Defendant); Michael Akhtarzad (Defendant); William Brennan (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Anita Neumann (Plaintiff); Natalie Hidalgo (Plaintiff); Gemsag Medical (Plaintiff); Gemsag On Melrose (Plaintiff); Spavergnugen (Plaintiff); City Life Rehabilitation, Pilates & Fitness Spa (Plaintiff); As to: Sina Akhtarzad (Defendant); Michael Akhtarzad (Defendant); William Brennan (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less