This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/19/2019 at 01:32:02 (UTC).

ANITA EDGARIAN VS STEPHANIE ROCHELLE KODISH ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/25/2018 ANITA EDGARIAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STEPHANIE ROCHELLE KODISH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3869

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

EDGARIAN ANITA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

FERRING PHARMACEUTICALS INC.

KODISH STEPHANIE ROCHELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BONHOLTZER ERIC

KELLOGG CAROL D. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MUHAR GEORGE

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PEARCE CHARLES W. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS -

4/25/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

4/25/2018: COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

4/25/2018: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER -

DEFENDANTS STEPHANIE ROCHELLE KODISH AND FERRING PHARMECEUTICALS INCS.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

6/1/2018: DEFENDANTS STEPHANIE ROCHELLE KODISH AND FERRING PHARMECEUTICALS INCS.S ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

6/1/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

Summons on Cross Complaint -

6/1/2018: Summons on Cross Complaint -

PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT, STEPHANIE ROCHELLE KODISH, AN INDIVIDUAL

5/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT, STEPHANIE ROCHELLE KODISH, AN INDIVIDUAL

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

7/3/2018: ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

7/11/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...)

10/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...) OF 10/07/2019

10/7/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE...) OF 10/07/2019

Notice of Settlement

10/7/2019: Notice of Settlement

Association of Attorney

7/19/2019: Association of Attorney

Association of Attorney

7/10/2019: Association of Attorney

Notice of Deposit - Jury

4/22/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Request for Dismissal

10/16/2019: Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Anita Edgarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 2, Kristin S. Escalante, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire...) of 10/07/2019); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Anita Edgarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Notice of Settlement of Entire...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Anita Edgarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketAssociation of Attorney; Filed by Stephanie Rochelle Kodish (Defendant); Ferring Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by Anita Edgarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Stephanie Rochelle Kodish (Defendant); Ferring Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Anita Edgarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT, STEPHANIE ROCHELLE KODISH, AN INDIVIDUAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anita Edgarian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY AND PROPERTY DAMAGE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketRequest-Waive Court Fees

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ferring Pharmaceuticals Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BONHOLTZER ERIC CRAIG

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLOGG CAROL D