This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/21/2021 at 22:17:32 (UTC).

ANICIA ESPINOSA, AN INDIVIDUAL VS GARDENA HOSPITAL, L.P., A TEXAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP D/B/A MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 ANICIA ESPINOSA, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GARDENA HOSPITAL, L P , A TEXAS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP D/B/A MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1459

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESPINOSA ANICIA

Defendant

GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. DBA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARITOONIAN NATALIE

Defendant Attorney

COLLINS COREY H.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

8/25/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/25/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/25/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/25/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Answer

10/6/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9/20/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

9/7/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • Hearing12/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Gardena Hospital, L.P. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by Anicia Espinosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Anicia Espinosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anicia Espinosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anicia Espinosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anicia Espinosa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GARDENA HOSPITAL L.P. DBA MEMORIAL HOSPITAL OF GARDENA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLINS COREY