This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/19/2023 at 06:46:52 (UTC).

ANI J. ADAMIAN VS KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2022 ANI J ADAMIAN filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6320

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADAMIAN ANI J.

Defendants

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC.

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

KAISER PERMANENTE

KAISER PERMANENTE HOSPITALS

KAISER PERMANENTE INSURANCE COMPANY

KAISER PERMANENTE WOODLAND HILLS MEDICAL CENTER

PONTOPPIDAN KIMI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID JOHN

Defendant Attorney

ROWLEY CHRISTIAN J.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/17/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/17/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/17/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

11/17/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

11/17/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

11/17/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

11/28/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/6/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

12/21/2022: Answer

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • Hearing03/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 31 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company (Defendant); Kimi Pontoppidan (Defendant); As to: Ani J. Adamian (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ani J. Adamian (Plaintiff); As to: Kimi Pontoppidan (Defendant); Service Date: 11/30/2022; Service Cost: 117.85; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ani J. Adamian (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Service Date: 11/22/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ani J. Adamian (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 11/22/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ani J. Adamian (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Permanente (Defendant); Service Date: 11/22/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ani J. Adamian (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Permanente Woodland Hills Medical Center (Defendant); Service Date: 11/22/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ani J. Adamian (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company (Defendant); Service Date: 11/22/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ani J. Adamian (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Permanente Hospitals (Defendant); Service Date: 11/22/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketAddress for John David (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/17/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ani J. Adamian (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ani J. Adamian (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ani J. Adamian (Plaintiff); As to: Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc. (Defendant); Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Yolanda Orozco in Department 31 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kaiser Permanente Hospital is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER PERMANENTE SOUTH BAY MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant