This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 13:07:13 (UTC).

ANGIE MARTINEZ VS ISABELLA COOK

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 ANGIE MARTINEZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ISABELLA COOK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0807

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ ANGIE

Defendant

COOK ISABELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SETAREH DANIEL ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL CHRISTINA

 

Court Documents

Complaint

3/19/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/19/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/19/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/19/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

4/6/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

4/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/5/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

8/5/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2024
  • Hearing03/15/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • Hearing09/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Hearing09/02/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Isabella Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Isabella Cook (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Angie Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Angie Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Angie Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SETAREH DANIEL ESQ.