This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/25/2021 at 18:39:16 (UTC).

ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, L.P., A, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, L P , A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1560

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION INC.

Defendants

AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY

FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND

PRESERVATION LP/WEST THIRD APARTMENTS

RED STONE

SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION L.P. A

VETERAN HOUSING PARTNERSHIP

RED STONE PARTNERS

SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION L.P.

WEST THIRD APARTMENTD PRESERVATION L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDRADE RICHARD BRUCE

KRISTEDJA STEPHEN

Defendant Attorney

BREUCOP PAUL A

 

Court Documents

Answer

11/24/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/7/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/9/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

9/15/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

9/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (1ST)

Notice of Lis Pendens - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS [FIRST AMENDED]

9/22/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS [FIRST AMENDED]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/28/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/5/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/5/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

10/5/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Mail

10/5/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Lis Pendens - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS -SECOND AMENDED NOTICE

10/6/2021: Notice of Lis Pendens - NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS -SECOND AMENDED NOTICE

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • Hearing01/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION, L.P. (Defendant); VETERAN HOUSING PARTNERSHIP (Defendant); FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens (-Second Amended Notice); Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens ([First Amended]); Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ANGELUS WATERPROOFING AND RESTORATION, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEST THIRD APARTMENTS PRESERVATION LP is a litigant

Latest cases where SHANGRI-LA CONSTRUCTION L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where ANGELUS WATERPROOFING & RESTORATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY AND DEPOSIT COMPANY OF MARYLAND is a litigant