This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2019 at 03:35:53 (UTC).

ANGELO PEREZ VS EARL HELLUM

Case Summary

On 12/19/2017 ANGELO PEREZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EARL HELLUM. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOANNE O'DONNELL, MONICA BACHNER and TERESA A. BEAUDET. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7610

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOANNE O'DONNELL

MONICA BACHNER

TERESA A. BEAUDET

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

PEREZ ANGELO

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 5

HELLUM EARL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

SABOL CRISTOPHER G.

Defendant Attorneys

LONG H. G.

BUTLER L'TANYA M.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

7/13/2018: Unknown

Minute Order

7/16/2018: Minute Order

ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

8/20/2018: ORDER RE: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT

DECLARATION OF H. G. LONG OF ATTEMPTS TO MEET AND CONFER AND INABLITY TO DO SO

8/24/2018: DECLARATION OF H. G. LONG OF ATTEMPTS TO MEET AND CONFER AND INABLITY TO DO SO

Minute Order

9/27/2018: Minute Order

Declaration

10/10/2018: Declaration

Case Management Statement

11/2/2018: Case Management Statement

Declaration

11/2/2018: Declaration

Unknown

11/8/2018: Unknown

Proof of Service by Mail

11/13/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Motion for Protective Order

12/12/2018: Motion for Protective Order

Case Management Statement

1/18/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/29/2019: Case Management Statement

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

1/29/2019: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO SERVE AND HEAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THE RELATED UNLAWFUL DETAINER; ETC

12/29/2017: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO SERVE AND HEAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THE RELATED UNLAWFUL DETAINER; ETC

Minute Order

12/29/2017: Minute Order

VERIFIED COMPLAINT 1. RETALIATION [VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 1942.5]; ETC

12/19/2017: VERIFIED COMPLAINT 1. RETALIATION [VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 1942.5]; ETC

SUMMONS

12/19/2017: SUMMONS

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Protective Order (or in the alternative, to compel discovery responses and sanctions) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (defendant to respond to comply with his response to plaintiff's request for production of documents' set one and two) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted (and for sanctions ( Plaintiff )) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Compel defendant to respond to comply wi...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • Order (re Plaintiff's motion to compel, motion to deem admitted and motion for protective order); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike ((Legacy)) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Strike (portions of the complaint) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) (plaintiff's first amended complaint) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 50, Teresa A. Beaudet, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 28; Ex-Parte Proceedings (Exparte proceeding; Denied) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Minute order entered: 2017-12-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • Ex-Parte Application; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO SERVE AND HEAR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE THE RELATED UNLAWFUL DETAINER; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Angelo Perez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • VERIFIED COMPLAINT 1. RETALIATION [VIOLATION OF CIVIL CODE 1942.5]; ETC

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC687610    Hearing Date: December 20, 2019    Dept: 50

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

angelo perez,

Plaintiff,

vs.

earl hellum, et al.

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 687610

Hearing Date:

December 20, 2019

Hearing Time:

8:30 a.m.

ORDER RE:

(1) MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO, OR COMPLY WITH HIS RESPONSE TO, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SETS ONE AND TWO;

(2) MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER, OR TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND SANCTIONS; AND

(3) MOTION TO DEEM ADMISSIONS ADMITTED AND SANCTIONS

Plaintiff Angelo Perez (“Perez”) moves to compel Defendant Earl Hellum (“Hellum”) to provide responses to certain written discovery and to have certain requests for admissions deemed admitted in light of Hellum’s failure to provide responses.

On June 28, 2019, the Court ordered that the parties must participate in an informal discovery conference (“IDC”) with the Court concerning the issues raised in Perez’s motions. The Court indicated that the three motions would be heard today in the event that the IDC was unsuccessful. However, it does not appear that the IDC has taken place, nor have the parties filed their required IDC statements. Accordingly, Perez’s three motions will be taken off calendar unless the parties appear at the hearing and indicate that they have reserved an IDC. In that event, the hearings will be continued to the IDC date for resetting. Please note the following:

Code of Civil Procedure section 2016.080, subdivision (a) provides: “If an informal resolution is not reached by the parties, as described in Section 2016.040, the court may conduct an informal discovery conference upon request by a party or on the court's own motion for the purpose of discussing discovery matters in dispute between the parties.” Pursuant to that section, and the Court’s power to “amend and control its process and orders so as to make them conform to law and justice” pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 128, subdivision (a)(8), the Court orders the parties in this case to participate in an IDC.

Lead or other designated counsel for the parties with full authority are ordered to participate in an IDC pursuant to the Court’s power under Code of Civil Procedure section 128(a)(8). Counsel are ordered to bring with them whatever materials are needed to make the IDC session productive and successful.

Prior to the IDC date, lead or other designated counsel for the parties, with full authority, are to meet and confer, in person or via telephone in a further attempt to resolve as many of the issues as possible before the IDC. (See CRC Rule 3.670(f)(2).) If the parties resolve their discovery disputes before the IDC date, Perez is ordered to take both the IDC and these three motions off calendar as soon as possible.

Perez is ordered to provide notice of this Order.

DATED: December 20, 2019

_____________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court