This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2021 at 13:32:35 (UTC).

ANGELO DIMAURO VS GLI AUDACI LA LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2020 ANGELO DIMAURO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against GLI AUDACI LA LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4218

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIMAURO ANGELO

Defendants

OASIS OUTSOURCING III INC.

GLI AUDACI LA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HURWITZ CORY

Defendant Attorney

THURRELL JEFFREY RICHARD

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/15/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

2/9/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

2/25/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

3/11/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-ARBITRATION STATUS CONFERENCE)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/18/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

8/24/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT MATTER TO ARBITRATION

6/8/2020: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SUBMIT MATTER TO ARBITRATION

Proof of Personal Service

5/1/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/1/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

5/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/13/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/13/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

4/13/2020: Complaint

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Angelo DiMauro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 54, Maurice A. Leiter, Presiding; Post-Arbitration Status Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Arbitration Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNotice (Notice of Case Reassignment); Filed by Angelo DiMauro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 96; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Reassignment); Filed by Angelo DiMauro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Submit Matter to Arbitration); Filed by GLI Audaci LA LLC (Defendant); Oasis Outsourcing III Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Angelo DiMauro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Angelo DiMauro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Angelo DiMauro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Angelo DiMauro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Angelo DiMauro (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OASIS OUTSOURCING III INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HURWITZ CORY