This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/25/2021 at 17:06:25 (UTC).

ANGELIQUE GABRIELLE BOUTON, ET AL. VS EDWARD BIGGS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 ANGELIQUE GABRIELLE BOUTON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EDWARD BIGGS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are KENNETH R. FREEMAN, SAMANTHA JESSNER, WILLIAM F. FAHEY, MEL RED RECANA, YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS, WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER and DAVID J. COWAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3030

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

SAMANTHA JESSNER

WILLIAM F. FAHEY

MEL RED RECANA

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

WILLIAM F. HIGHBERGER

DAVID J. COWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BOUTON ANGELIQUE GABRIELLE

MORIARTY TODD

KANNER BONNIE

O'MALLEY JAMES

STEEN DAVID

GAAL NICOS SANDOR

MATTSON BRIE

KELLER JULIE

MINKY MICHAEL

SAMUELS KATHERINE

ROSS LISA

BROWN MICHELLE

O'NEILL MICHELLE

GARBER GREGORY

STEEN TRICIA

DRAKE STEVEN

KELLER WALTER

MAHER MIRKO

ETLIN STUART

Defendant

BIGGS EDWARD

80 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BROWN THOMAS MICHAEL

MENARD JEAN-PAUL

Defendant Attorneys

RUBIN JULIE H

STRAUS DOUGLAS C.

GALLEGOS PAUL

WILLIAMSON ROBERT

PENTECOST JOHN H

LAZORISAK TERI

KELLEHER THOMAS R.

 

Court Documents

Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT RE: STATUS CONFERENCE ON DECEMBER 17, 2020

12/10/2020: Joint Status Conference Report - JOINT STATUS REPORT RE: STATUS CONFERENCE ON DECEMBER 17, 2020

Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE NOVEMBER 3, 2020 STATUS CONFERENCE

11/9/2020: Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE NOVEMBER 3, 2020 STATUS CONFERENCE

Informal Discovery Conference Report - Complex - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE REPORT - COMPLEX BIGGS DEFENDANTS' AND PLAINTIFFS' JOINT SUMMARY RE: BIGGS DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF D

9/25/2020: Informal Discovery Conference Report - Complex - INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE REPORT - COMPLEX BIGGS DEFENDANTS' AND PLAINTIFFS' JOINT SUMMARY RE: BIGGS DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM WAIVER OF D

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT DEFENDANTS MARGIE LOPEZS AND PETER RODRIGUEZS JOINT SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SE

7/20/2020: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT DEFENDANTS MARGIE LOPEZS AND PETER RODRIGUEZS JOINT SEPARATE STATEMENT IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SE

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

7/2/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE

7/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING RE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

6/2/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING RE MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/18/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/22/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF FORM INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABIL

2/10/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF FORM INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT PACIFIC PALISADES BOWL MOBILE ESTATES, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABIL

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PETE RODRIGUEZ

2/10/2020: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO PETE RODRIGUEZ

Separate Statement

2/10/2020: Separate Statement

Answer

11/27/2019: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

10/3/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

10/31/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/24/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Objection - OBJECTION TO NON-COMPLEX CASE DETERMINATION

10/10/2019: Objection - OBJECTION TO NON-COMPLEX CASE DETERMINATION

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

10/3/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

129 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Counsel); Filed by Precision Manufactured Developments Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketJoint Status Conference Report (on January 19, 2021); Filed by Edward Biggs (Defendant); Pacific Palisades Bowl Mobile Estates, LLC (Defendant); Pacific Palisades Bowl Mobile Estates, LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (Re December 17, 2020 Status Conference); Filed by Angelique Gabrielle Bouton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • Docketat 2:30 PM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Further Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Further Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketJoint Status Report RE: Status Conference On December 17, 2020; Filed by Angelique Gabrielle Bouton (Plaintiff); John Bouton (Plaintiff); Jonathan Brown (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketStipulation and Protective Order Regarding Confidential and Highly Confidential Designations; Filed by Angelique Gabrielle Bouton (Plaintiff); John Bouton (Plaintiff); Jonathan Brown (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (on Amended motion to be relieved as counsel for Geoffrey Axelrod, Taylor Brayton, Rodney Carrington and Jeff Haptonstal); Filed by Angelique Gabrielle Bouton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDeclaration of Jean-Paul Menard in further support of Amended Motion to be relieved as counsel for Geoffrey, Axelrod, Taylor Brayton, Rodney Carrington and Jeff Haptonstal; Filed by Angelique Gabrielle Bouton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docketat 11:00 AM in Department 10, William F. Highberger, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to be Relieved as Counsel (by Brown White & Osborn LLP, as counsel for Geoffrey Axelrod, Taylor Brayton, Rodney Carrington and Jeff Hapstonstal) - Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
188 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2019
  • Docketat 11:49 AM in Department 1, David J. Cowan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court) of 10/02/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Reassignment to an Independent Calendar Court)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 14, Kenneth R. Freeman, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;) of 09/30/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order Re Non-Complex Determination;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint ( (1st)); Filed by Angelique Gabrielle Bouton (Plaintiff); John Bouton (Plaintiff); Jonathan Brown (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Angelique Gabrielle Bouton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Angelique Gabrielle Bouton (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLEHER THOMAS R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julie H. Rubin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Straus, Douglas C.