This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/01/2023 at 08:01:04 (UTC).

ANGELICA YANG VS DR. BERVIC B JOHNS, JR., MD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 ANGELICA YANG filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against DR BERVIC B JOHNS, JR , MD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse South located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1693

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

YANG ANGELICA

LIU JINGSHUANG

Defendants

JOHNS DR. BERVIC B JR. MD

KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC

KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOSHARIAN PETER ASHOT

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/4/2022: Complaint

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

11/4/2022: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/8/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/8/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/8/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/12/2022: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2023
  • Hearing03/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department L at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Hearing03/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department L at 400 Civic Center Plaza, Pomona, CA 91766; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pomona Courthouse South in Department L - Hon. Peter A. Hernandezeffective 12/19/2022; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- 03/30/2023 Case Management Conference: Location changed from Department O to Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- 03/30/2023 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Department O to Department L

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Angelica Yang (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Bervic B Johns, Jr., MD (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem: Filed By: Angelica Yang (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/08/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 03/30/2023 at 08:30 AM in Pomona Courthouse South at Department O

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Peter A. Hernandez in Department O Pomona Courthouse South

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Angelica Yang (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Bervic B Johns, Jr., MD (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Angelica Yang (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Bervic B Johns, Jr., MD (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem; Signed and Filed by: Angelica Yang (Plaintiff); As to: Dr. Bervic B Johns, Jr., MD (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc (Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA PERMANENTE MEDICAL GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HOSHARIAN PETER A. ESQ.