This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2021 at 06:58:22 (UTC).

ANGELICA ROSARIO AN INDIVIDUAL VS MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 ANGELICA ROSARIO AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2092

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSARIO AN INDIVIDUAL ANGELICA

Defendant

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PISHVAEE SIAMAK

Defendant Attorney

WESIERSKI CHRISTOPHER PAUL

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/16/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/15/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/15/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/15/2021: Complaint

Motion to Stay Execution

12/17/2021: Motion to Stay Execution

Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

12/17/2021: Motion to Strike (not initial pleading)

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

12/17/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/22/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/08/2022
  • Hearing06/08/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • Hearing02/23/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • Hearing02/09/2022 at 08:45 AM in Department 14 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Stay Execution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketMotion to Stay Execution; Filed by MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY, A California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDemurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10); Filed by MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY, A California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketMotion to Strike (not initial pleading); Filed by MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY, A California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Angelica Rosario an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Angelica Rosario an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Angelica Rosario an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Angelica Rosario an individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PISHVAEE SIAMAK