This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 12:32:19 (UTC).

ANGELICA DAVIS, ET AL. VS WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 ANGELICA DAVIS, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TERRY GREEN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8247

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TERRY GREEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

COLLIER JUDEA M.

DAVIS ANGELICA

BILAAL MUHAMMAD

CHILDS JIMMELL A.

Defendant and Appellant

WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANYIA ALFRED O.

Defendant Attorney

HOCKADAY BRIDGET K.

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

7/8/2022: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED (B321429)

7/13/2022: Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED (B321429)

Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

6/8/2022: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

5/24/2022: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUD...) OF 05/04/2022, MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION T

5/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUD...) OF 05/04/2022, MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION T

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

5/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)

Order - COURT'S ORDER FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT HEARING HELD 5/4/22.

5/13/2022: Order - COURT'S ORDER FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT HEARING HELD 5/4/22.

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/16/2022

5/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/16/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUD...) OF 05/04/2022

5/4/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUD...) OF 05/04/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUD...)

5/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUD...)

Reply - REPLY RE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

4/26/2022: Reply - REPLY RE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/26/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/19/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL, LLC'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

4/19/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL, LLC'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT

Proof of Personal Service

2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION, OR SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT

2/24/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION, OR SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON APPLI...)

2/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON APPLI...)

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B321429): As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B321429): As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B321429); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Angelica Davis (Plaintiff); Muhammad Bilaal (Plaintiff); Jimmell A. Childs (Plaintiff); Judea M. Collier (Plaintiff); As to: World Unity International, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 05/26/2022 at 08:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 updated: Result Date to 05/26/2022; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...) of 05/04/2022, Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)]; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by: World Unity International, LLC, a California Corporation (Appellant); As to: Angelica Davis (Respondent); Muhammad Bilaal (Respondent); Jimmell A. Childs (Respondent) et al. To be paid at Central: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Judea: Status Date changed from 04/06/2020 to 03/02/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Terry Green in Department 14 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jimmell A. Childs (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Judea M. Collier (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Muhammad Bilaal (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Angelica Davis (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Angelica Davis (Plaintiff); Muhammad Bilaal (Plaintiff); Jimmell A. Childs (Plaintiff); Judea M. Collier (Plaintiff); As to: World Unity International, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jimmell A. Childs (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Judea M. Collier (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less