*******8247
03/02/2020
Disposed - Judgment Entered
Contract - Other Contract
Los Angeles, California
TERRY GREEN
COLLIER JUDEA M.
DAVIS ANGELICA
BILAAL MUHAMMAD
CHILDS JIMMELL A.
WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL LLC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
ANYIA ALFRED O.
HOCKADAY BRIDGET K.
7/8/2022: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
7/13/2022: Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed - APPEAL - REMITTITUR - APPEAL DISMISSED (B321429)
6/8/2022: Appeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal
5/24/2022: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed
5/25/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUD...) OF 05/04/2022, MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION T
5/26/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)
5/13/2022: Order - COURT'S ORDER FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT HEARING HELD 5/4/22.
5/16/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/16/2022
5/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
5/4/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUD...) OF 05/04/2022
5/4/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUD...)
4/26/2022: Reply - REPLY RE OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT
4/26/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
4/19/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
4/19/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' WORLD UNITY INTERNATIONAL, LLC'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT
2/22/2022: Proof of Personal Service
2/24/2022: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION, OR SHORTEN TIME FOR MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM DEFAULT
2/25/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON APPLI...)
DocketUpdated -- Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B321429): As To Parties: removed
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Appeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B321429): As To Parties: removed
[-] Read LessDocketAppeal - Remittitur - Appeal Dismissed (B321429); Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: Angelica Davis (Plaintiff); Muhammad Bilaal (Plaintiff); Jimmell A. Childs (Plaintiff); Judea M. Collier (Plaintiff); As to: World Unity International, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction
[-] Read LessDocketAppeal - Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination)
[-] Read LessDocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 05/26/2022 at 08:45 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 14 updated: Result Date to 05/26/2022; Result Type to Held
[-] Read LessDocketCertificate of Mailing for [Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...) of 05/04/2022, Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and Default Jud...)]; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed; Filed by: World Unity International, LLC, a California Corporation (Appellant); As to: Angelica Davis (Respondent); Muhammad Bilaal (Respondent); Jimmell A. Childs (Respondent) et al. To be paid at Central: No
[-] Read LessDocketMinute Order (Court Order)
[-] Read LessDocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Judea: Status Date changed from 04/06/2020 to 03/02/2020
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Terry Green in Department 14 Stanley Mosk Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Jimmell A. Childs (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Judea M. Collier (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Muhammad Bilaal (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Angelica Davis (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Angelica Davis (Plaintiff); Muhammad Bilaal (Plaintiff); Jimmell A. Childs (Plaintiff); Judea M. Collier (Plaintiff); As to: World Unity International, LLC, a California Corporation (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
[-] Read LessDocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Jimmell A. Childs (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Judea M. Collier (Plaintiff)
[-] Read Less