This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/21/2022 at 22:29:34 (UTC).

ANGELICA CARRILLO VS T.J. MAXX OF CA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 ANGELICA CARRILLO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against T J MAXX OF CA, LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6653

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARRILLO ANGELICA

Defendants

DOE CHELSEA

T.J. MAXX OF CA LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA TJ MAXX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM JACE

 

Court Documents

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

2/23/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

2/23/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

2/23/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/23/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/23/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/23/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/23/2022: Complaint

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/25/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

5/9/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION; [PROPOSED] ORDER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING...)

5/9/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING...) OF 05/09/2022

5/9/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING...) OF 05/09/2022

Proof of Personal Service

4/25/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Ruling

6/17/2022: Notice of Ruling

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2022
  • Hearing11/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 48 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by ANGELICA CARRILLO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • Docketat 5:00 PM in Department 48, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: Joint Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding...) of 05/09/2022); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: Joint Stipulation to Submit Matter to Binding...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketStipulation and Order (JOINT STIPULATION TO SUBMIT MATTER TO BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY ACTION; [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by ANGELICA CARRILLO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANGELICA CARRILLO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ANGELICA CARRILLO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ANGELICA CARRILLO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ANGELICA CARRILLO (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T.J. MAXX OF CA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JACE