This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2021 at 11:25:50 (UTC).

ANGELIA B. PARRISH VS BJ'S RESTAURANTS, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 ANGELIA B PARRISH filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against BJ'S RESTAURANTS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1785

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARRISH ANGELIA B.

Defendant

BJ'S RESTAURANTS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SANCHEZ YESENIA

Defendant Attorney

GOBEL SEVAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

6/10/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

PI General Order

6/17/2021: PI General Order

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/17/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

Answer

8/16/2021: Answer

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2024
  • Hearing06/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • Hearing12/08/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Hearing11/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by BJ's Restaurants, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Angelia B. Parrish (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Angelia B. Parrish (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Angelia B. Parrish (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BJ'S RESTAURANTS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANCHEZ YESENIA