This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2019 at 18:34:17 (UTC).

ANGELA TAFOYA VS HARRIS MARKETING GROUP

Case Summary

On 05/26/2017 ANGELA TAFOYA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HARRIS MARKETING GROUP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOLLY E. KENDIG and ELAINE LU. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3204

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOLLY E. KENDIG

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TAFOYA ANGELA

Defendant

HARRIS MARKETING GROUP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NOVAK SEAN MICHAEL

BUCKLEY JOSEPH LLOYD

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

10/17/2018: Minute Order

Notice

10/17/2018: Notice

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

12/7/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice

12/17/2018: Notice

Declaration re: Due Diligence

1/17/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

1/17/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/17/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order

1/17/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Order

1/17/2019: Case Management Order

Notice

1/18/2019: Notice

Unknown

1/22/2019: Unknown

Declaration

2/21/2019: Declaration

Case Management Order

2/25/2019: Case Management Order

Minute Order

2/25/2019: Minute Order

Notice

4/4/2019: Notice

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/22/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order

4/26/2019: Minute Order

Notice

4/29/2019: Notice

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF OSC RE DEFAULT); Filed by Angela Tafoya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (sanctions and/or dismissal) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: sanctions and/or dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Angela Tafoya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • DocketNotice (OF OSC RE DEFAULT AND CMC); Filed by Angela Tafoya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 26, Elaine Lu, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (proof of service on First Amended Complaint and entry of default) - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: proof of service on First Amended Com...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketDeclaration ( OF SEAN M. NOV AK IN RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE ISSUED REGARDING PROOF OF SERVICE); Filed by Angela Tafoya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2017
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2017-09-27 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Angela Tafoya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Angela Tafoya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE & OSC RE PROOF OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGFS 1. FRAUD/DECEIT/INTENTIONAL MISREPRESENTATION ; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Angela Tafoya (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****3204    Hearing Date: February 26, 2020    Dept: 26

****3204

The Court has read and considered Plaintiff’s request for dismissal of punitive damages filed on February 13, 2020 as well as Plaintiff’s default judgment prove-up brief filed on February 13, 2020.

Plaintiff cannot claim civil penalties for Willful Misclassification as there is no private right of action under that statute. (See Noe v. Superior Court (2015) 237 Cal.App.4th 316, 337 [“ section 226.8 . There is no language suggesting a private plaintiff may bring a direct action under section 226.8 )

If Plaintiff concurs with the analysis above, Plaintiff may file a request for dismissal of the third cause of action of the First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff should also file a new request for entry of default judgment (on form CIV-100) and a new proposed default judgment (on form JUD-100) in the amount of $ 221,515.71 principal damages, $4,105.16 attorneys’ fees, and $571.40 costs, for a total judgment of $226,192.27. In other words, Plaintiff should revise the proposed amounts on pages 8 and 9 of Plaintiff’s February 13, 2020 brief by deleting the $25,000 civil penalties for the third cause of action. Upon the filing of the dismissal of the third cause of action, the revised request for default judgment, and the revised proposed default judgment, the Court would be prepared to enter default judgment on the remaining causes of action.

If Plaintiff disagrees with the Court’s analysis above, Plaintiff may file supplemental briefing regarding the availability of civil penalties under Section 226.8 as a private right of action notwithstanding Noe v. Superior Court (2015) 237 Cal.App.4th 316, 337.

The Court requests that Plaintiff deliver to Department 26 conformed courtesy copies of the filings above within three days of filing.

The OSC re entry of default judgment is continued to April 23, 2020 at 8:30 am to provide Plaintiff an opportunity to either file supplemental briefing or to file a request for dismissal of the third cause of action, revised request for entry of default judgment and revised proposed default judgment.

The Court’s Judicial Assistant is to give notice to all parties.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Lloyd Buckley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NOVAK SEAN M