This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2023 at 12:39:41 (UTC).

ANGELA STEWART VS UNITED VALET PARKING, INC., A CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 ANGELA STEWART filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UNITED VALET PARKING, INC , A CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHELLE C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7491

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHELLE C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEWART ANGELA

Defendants

UNITED VALET PARKING INC. A CORPORATION

DOE 1 DOE 2 DOE 3 DOE 4 AND DOE 5 INDIVIDUALLY DBA UNITED VALET PARKING

MONCADA JAVIER

DOE 6 DOE 7 DOE 8 DOE 9 AND DOE 10 INDVIDUALLY DBA NAI CAPITAL PROPERTY SERVICES

BD ADVISORS GP LLC

DIAMOND CAPITAL GROUP LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUDMAN JEFFREY A.

Defendant Attorney

HOBSON SUSAN ELAINE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

8/10/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 08/10/2023

8/10/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE) OF 08/10/2023

Notice of Settlement

8/9/2023: Notice of Settlement

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

7/13/2023: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

3/7/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

3/1/2023: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/22/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/26/2022: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR LIEN

1/13/2022: Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR LIEN

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

11/12/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

7/13/2021: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

5/25/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

6/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATES

PI General Order

6/1/2021: PI General Order

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

5/14/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2023
  • Hearing11/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case) of 08/10/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Final Status Conference scheduled for 12/22/2023 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/08/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 08/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by: Angela Stewart (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketStipulation and Order to Continue Trial and Final Status Conference; Signed and Filed by: UNITED VALET PARKING, INC., a corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial and Final Status Conference: Filed By: UNITED VALET PARKING, INC., a corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 07/13/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Angela Stewart (Plaintiff); As to: BD Advisors GP, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: Angela Stewart (Plaintiff); As to: Diamond Capital Group, LP (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Angela Stewart (Plaintiff); As to: UNITED VALET PARKING, INC., a corporation (Defendant); Doe 1, Doe 2, Doe 3, Doe 4 and Doe 5, individually (Defendant); JAVIER MONCADA (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Angela Stewart (Plaintiff); As to: UNITED VALET PARKING, INC., a corporation (Defendant); Doe 1, Doe 2, Doe 3, Doe 4 and Doe 5, individually (Defendant); JAVIER MONCADA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Angela Stewart (Plaintiff); As to: UNITED VALET PARKING, INC., a corporation (Defendant); Doe 1, Doe 2, Doe 3, Doe 4 and Doe 5, individually (Defendant); JAVIER MONCADA (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 10/24/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 05/06/2024 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Thomas D. Long in Department 31 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less