This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/16/2022 at 06:11:44 (UTC).

ANGELA MARTINEZ VS JINON CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ENTITY

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 ANGELA MARTINEZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against JINON CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ENTITY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2524

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARTINEZ ANGELA

Defendant

JINON CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ENTITY DBA NIJIYA MARKET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARIAS JANETH

Defendant Attorney

WIENS KIERSTEN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/22/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/21/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

3/9/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer

4/8/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

4/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/13/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Order

5/5/2021: Case Management Order

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/5/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/5/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

4/20/2021: Case Management Statement

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • Hearing07/25/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • Hearing07/15/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Angela Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JINON CORPORATION, a California Corporation entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Angela Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by JINON CORPORATION, a California Corporation entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JINON CORPORATION, a California Corporation entity (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Angela Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Angela Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Angela Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Angela Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Angela Martinez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JINON CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ENTITY DBA NIJIYA MARKET is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIENS KIERSTEN