This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/09/2019 at 01:22:11 (UTC).

ANGELA FORGO VS HENDRICK KRUGER ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 ANGELA FORGO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HENDRICK KRUGER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MARC D. GROSS and JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5865

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MARC D. GROSS

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

FORGO ANGELA

Defendants and Respondents

ALAMO RENTAL LLC

ENTERPRISE VANGUARD CAR RENTAL USA INC

EAN HOLDINGS LLC

KRUGER HENDRICK

DOES 1 TO 50

Not Classified By Court

ENTERPRISE RENT-A-CAR COMPANY OF LOS ANGELES LLC ERRONEOUSLY SUED HEREIN AS ?ALAMO RENTAL US LLC?

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

STEINER JON M. ESQ.

STEINER JON MATTHEW ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

DALL TERRY S.

DALL TERRANCE SHAWN ESQ.

MILLER ADAM ISAAC

SELLERS RYAN M

STEPHAN PAUL E.

 

Court Documents

Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] OF THE COURT TO CONTINUE TRIAL

6/12/2019: Order - ORDER [PROPOSED] OF THE COURT TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRIAL DAT...)

6/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRIAL DAT...)

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRIAL DATE AND CONTINUE RELATED DATES

6/13/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO VACATE AND RESET TRIAL DATE AND CONTINUE RELATED DATES

Notice of Ruling

6/13/2019: Notice of Ruling

Association of Attorney

9/10/2019: Association of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

9/16/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

9/16/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Disassociation of Attorney

9/24/2019: Disassociation of Attorney

Association of Attorney

9/26/2019: Association of Attorney

Motion to Continue Trial Date

10/4/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER TO MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/7/19 RE EX PARTE...)

10/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER TO MINUTE ORDER DATED 10/7/19 RE EX PARTE...)

Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

10/7/2019: Order - ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Opposition - OPPOSITION EX PARTE OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES BY PLAINTIFF

10/7/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION EX PARTE OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES BY PLAINTIFF

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

10/7/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND REL...)

10/7/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE THE TRIAL AND REL...)

Substitution of Attorney

10/15/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/18/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2020
  • Hearing06/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • Hearing04/15/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • Hearing04/01/2020 at 10:00 AM in Department 3 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Continue Trial - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Hendrick Kruger (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Docketat 10:14 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Nunc Pro Tunc Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Alamo Rental LLC (Defendant); Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Alamo Rental LLC (Defendant); Ean Holdings LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Angela Forgo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Angela Forgo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Angela Forgo (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketCROSS COMPLAINT - PERS. INJURY PROPERTY DAMAGE, WRONG DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****5865    Hearing Date: October 29, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ANGELA FORGO,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

HENDRICK KRUGER, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

CASE NO: ****5865

[TENTATIVE] ORDER TAKING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

October 29, 2019

This motion appears to be moot in light of the Court’s 10/07/19 ruling continuing the trial date in this case to 4/15/20. The Court asks the parties to take matters off calendar promptly in the future if they become moot. Defendants are ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar. If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALAMO RENTAL (US) LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEINER JON MATTHEW