This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2020 at 22:49:22 (UTC).

ANGELA CHON LEE VS CHARLES MIN LEE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 ANGELA CHON LEE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against CHARLES MIN LEE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5291

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEE ANGELA CHON

Defendants

DRESBEN ZACHARY SCOTT

NOVOTNY JESSICA R

CHARLES M. LEE DDS INC.

LEE CHARLES MIN

LEE CHARLES M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FLORENCE BARRY G.

LEE THOMAS MIN

LEE THOMAS M

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

12/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

12/18/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/30/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

11/25/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • Hearing03/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 71 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Angela Chon Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Angela Chon Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Angela Chon Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Angela Chon Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Angela Chon Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Angela Chon Lee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less