This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/23/2019 at 10:30:35 (UTC).

ANGEL SHAW VS ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 05/16/2017 ANGEL SHAW filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH R. KALIN and MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1519

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH R. KALIN

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

SHAW ANGEL

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 40

ABBOTT NUTRITION

ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC

ABBOTT SALES MARKETING & DISTRIBUTION CO

NUTRITION ABBOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

JANET G. MARTIN

MARTIN JANET G.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

DAUSCHER SCOTT K. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION (GOVERNMENT CODE SECTI ON 12900, ET SEQ.) ;ETC

5/16/2017: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION (GOVERNMENT CODE SECTI ON 12900, ET SEQ.) ;ETC

SUMMONS

5/17/2017: SUMMONS

PLAINTIFF ANGEL SHAW'S MOTION FORPEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION; DECLARATION OF JANET G. MARTIN

5/26/2017: PLAINTIFF ANGEL SHAW'S MOTION FORPEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION; DECLARATION OF JANET G. MARTIN

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/8/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

6/9/2017: Minute Order

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/16/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

6/27/2017: DEFENDANTS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION AND EXHIBIT THERETO

6/29/2017: NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION AND EXHIBIT THERETO

Minute Order

8/24/2017: Minute Order

PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

9/7/2017: PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE, CONTINUANCE OF CMC AND SETTING OF OSC RE: SANCTIONS

9/7/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE, CONTINUANCE OF CMC AND SETTING OF OSC RE: SANCTIONS

Minute Order

9/20/2017: Minute Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2017
  • at 09:00 AM in Department 74; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Advanced to a Previous Date) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 55; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Order of Dismissal) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S DECLARATION IN RESPONSE TO COURT'S OSC RE: SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF NON-APPEARANCE, CONTINUANCE OF CMC AND SETTING OF OSC RE: SANCTIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Declaration; Filed by Angel Shaw (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Angel Shaw (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 55; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; No Appearance) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION AND EXHIBIT THERETO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2017
  • at 10:00 AM in Department 74; (Affidavit of Prejudice; Case is reassigned) -

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ANGEL SHAW'S MOTION FORPEREMPTORY DISQUALIFICATION; DECLARATION OF JANET G. MARTIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Angel Shaw (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • Summons; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by Angel Shaw (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL 1) DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION (GOVERNMENT CODE SECTI ON 12900, ET SEQ.) ;ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less