This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2022 at 09:19:12 (UTC).

ANGEL ROBERTSON, AN INDIVIDUAL, VS TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 ANGEL ROBERTSON, AN INDIVIDUAL, filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5540

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBERTSON AN INDIVIDUAL ANGEL

ROBERTSON ANGEL

Defendants

TRADER JOE'S COMPANY

TRADER JOE'S EAST INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HILAIRE MIKA M.

Defendant Attorneys

LAVI RACHAEL

DARROW TANJA LAVONNE

WADDELL GRACE

 

Court Documents

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

5/27/2022: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Answer

5/3/2022: Answer

Notice of Appearance

5/17/2022: Notice of Appearance

Request for Dismissal

4/18/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

4/18/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITH MOTION TO STRIKE (CCP 430.10); CAS...)

Request for Dismissal

4/13/2022: Request for Dismissal

Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN CONNECTION WITH DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/14/2022: Objection - OBJECTION TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN CONNECTION WITH DEFENDANTS DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TRADER JOES EAST INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/11/2022: Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TRADER JOES EAST INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TRADER JOES EAST, INC.'S AND TRADER JOES COMPANYS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/11/2022: Reply - REPLY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TRADER JOES EAST, INC.'S AND TRADER JOES COMPANYS MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Request for Judicial Notice

4/11/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice

4/11/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

1/13/2022: Unknown - DECLARATION OF DEMURRING PARTY IN SUPPORT OF AUTOMATIC EXTENSION

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/25/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

2/14/2022: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

3/14/2022: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Request for Judicial Notice

3/14/2022: Request for Judicial Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RACHAEL LAVI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TRADER JOES COMPANY AND TRADER JOES EAST INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RACHAEL LAVI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS TRADER JOES COMPANY AND TRADER JOES EAST INC.S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RACHAEL LAVI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TRADER JOES EAST INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

3/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RACHAEL LAVI IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT TRADER JOES EAST INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2022
  • Hearing08/10/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Trial Setting Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • Hearing07/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketNotice of Appearance; Filed by TRADER JOE'S COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by TRADER JOE'S COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by ANGEL ROBERTSON, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDeclaration of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension; Filed by TRADER JOE'S COMPANY, a California Corporation (Defendant); TRADER JOE'S EAST, INC., a Massachusetts Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference]); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANGEL ROBERTSON, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by ANGEL ROBERTSON, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ANGEL ROBERTSON, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ANGEL ROBERTSON, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ANGEL ROBERTSON, an individual, (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRADER JOE'S EAST INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TRADER JOE'S COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WADDELL GRACE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAVI RACHAEL SARAH