This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/07/2020 at 15:35:01 (UTC).

ANGEL RIOS ET AL VS ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/26/2018 ANGEL RIOS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GEORGINA T. RIZK, KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE, MARK A. BORENSTEIN and JOHN A. TORRIBIO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3896

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GEORGINA T. RIZK

KRISTIN S. ESCALANTE

MARK A. BORENSTEIN

JOHN A. TORRIBIO

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Petitioners, Respondents and Cross Defendants

MORENNO DONNA

MORENO JONATHAN

RIOS ANGEL

RIOS BY AND THROUGH HER GUARDIAN AD LITEM RICHARD RIOS ANGEL

Plaintiffs, Defendants, Petitioners, Respondents and Cross Defendants

MORENO JONATHAN

RIOS RICHARD

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY (ARCO)

MJM VALLEJO MINI MARKET

VALLEJO MARTIN V.

ARCO AMPM

DOES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

ATLANTIC RICHFIELD COMPANY ARCO

AMPM ARCO

TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY

OROZCO ANDREW

HERNANDEZ-GONZALEZ OSCAR

RODRIGUEZ JENNIFER THERESA

MONTANO ERWIN

CHAVEZ RAYMOND

ORIGEL MARISOL

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

TESORO REFINING & MARKETING COMPANY

Guardian Ad Litems, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

MORENO DONNA

RIOS RICHARD

Defendant, Respondent, Guardian Ad Litem and Not Classified By Court

RIOS RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

MENDEZ GIANCARLO J.

ALDER C. MICHAEL ESQ.

BURKES JENNIFER PARKINSON

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

PEREZ PHILLIP ALLAN TRAJAN

JOHNSON THOMAS THOR

TROPIO SCOTT T

PEREZ PHILLIP ALLAN TRAJAN ESQ.

JOHNSON THOMAS THOR ESQ.

TROPIO SCOTT THOMAS ESQ.

HART JR. JAMES P. ESQ.

HART JR. JAMES P.

MITCHEL STEVEN MARTIN

HURWITZ DANIEL SCOTT

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

7/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/6/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Case Management Statement

3/6/2020: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...) OF 02/13/2020, MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDI

2/13/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER REGARDING SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...) OF 02/13/2020, MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDI

Order - COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

2/7/2020: Order - COURT ORDER RE: TRANSFER OF COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

2/6/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (1. HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION ON STIPULATION OF PARTIES...)

2/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (1. HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION ON STIPULATION OF PARTIES...)

Request for Dismissal

1/27/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AS COUNSEL FOR JO...) OF 01/17/2020

1/17/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL AS COUNSEL FOR JO...) OF 01/17/2020

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/2/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, JO...) OF 11/25/2019

11/25/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, JO...) OF 11/25/2019

Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE

11/8/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

7/11/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

APPUCATN AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD UTEM?GIVIL EX PARTE

8/28/2018: APPUCATN AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD UTEM?GIVIL EX PARTE

Other - - First Amended complaint for damages for: 1. Negligence;2. Premises liability demand for Jury Trial

10/25/2018: Other - - First Amended complaint for damages for: 1. Negligence;2. Premises liability demand for Jury Trial

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/14/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM RE: ANGEL

3/25/2019: Notice of Rejection - Ex Parte Application Without Hearing - NOTICE OF REJECTION - EX PARTE APPLICATION WITHOUT HEARING FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM RE: ANGEL

COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

4/26/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

71 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2020
  • Hearing11/09/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Hearing11/09/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: regarding service/answer/responsive pleading/default as to the cross defendants on the cross complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • Hearing11/09/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department F at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDeclaration ((Declaration Ordered by Court)); Filed by Erwin Montano (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Daniel S. Hurwitz in Response to Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Responses of Cross- Defendnats to Cross-Complaint of Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company LLC); Filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without Prejudice as to Marisol Origel, from First Amended Cross Complaint on 6/26/2020); Filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Tesoro Refining & Marketing Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
92 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Donna Morenno (Plaintiff); Jonathan Moreno (Plaintiff); Angel Rios, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Richard Rios (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketFirst Amended complaint for damages for: 1. Negligence;2. Premises liability demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Jonathan Moreno (Plaintiff); Angel Rios, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Richard Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Jonathan Moreno (Plaintiff); Angel Rios, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Richard Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketAPPUCATN AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD UTEM GIVIL EX PARTE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketApplication ; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION - APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Donna Morenno (Plaintiff); Jonathan Moreno (Plaintiff); Angel Rios, by and through her Guardian Ad Litem, Richard Rios (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: 1. NEGLIGENCE; 2. PREMISES LIABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC703896    Hearing Date: January 17, 2020    Dept: 29

Rios et al. v. Atlantic Richfield Co. et al.

The unopposed Motion by Giancarlo Mendez and Michael Sanchez to be Relieved as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff, Jonathan Moreno, by and through Guardian ad Litem, Donna Moreno, is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with the requirements of Cal Rules of Court 3.1362.

This ruling is not effective until proof of service of the order on Plaintiff, Jonathan Moreno, by and through his Guardian ad Litem, Donna Moreno, is filed in this action. Until then, counsel continues to be counsel of record.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Case Number: BC703896    Hearing Date: November 25, 2019    Dept: 2

Rios, et al. v. Atlantic Richfield Co., et al.

The unopposed Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record for Plaintiff, Jonathan Moreno, by and through Guardian ad Litem, Donna Moreno, is GRANTED. Counsel has complied with the requirements of Cal Rules of Court 3.1362. PLEASE NOTE THAT THIS RULING IS NOT EFFECTIVE UNTIL PROOF OF SERVICE OF THE ORDER ON PLAINTIFF JONATHAN MORENO, BY AND THROUGH GAL DONNA MORENO IS FILED IN THIS ACTION. UNTIL THEN, COUNSEL CONTINUES TO BE COUNSEL OF RECORD.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.