This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2019 at 23:49:12 (UTC).

ANGEL PAIZ GARCIA VS SUPERIOR ENTERPRISES LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 11/07/2017 ANGEL PAIZ GARCIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SUPERIOR ENTERPRISES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2295

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

GARCIA ANGEL PAIZ

ROES 1-50 INCLUSIVE

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

KAZEM HADI

SUPERIOR ENTERPRISES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HANASSAB FRED F. ESQ.

Defendant Attorney

HOFFMAN GARY L

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/7/2017: Complaint

Summons

11/7/2017: Summons

CoverSheet

11/7/2017: CoverSheet

Motion to Compel

6/14/2019: Motion to Compel

Notice of Ruling

3/12/2019: Notice of Ruling

Ex Parte Application

3/11/2019: Ex Parte Application

Minute Order

3/11/2019: Minute Order

Order

3/11/2019: Order

Cross-Complaint

2/11/2019: Cross-Complaint

Summons

2/11/2019: Summons

Summons

2/7/2019: Summons

Cross-Complaint

2/6/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer

2/5/2019: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

2/5/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2019
  • DocketMotion to Compel (RESPONSES TO WRITTEN DISCOVERY); Filed by Superior Enterprises, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Superior Enterprises, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (for an order shortening time to immediately hear defendant's motion to continue trial and final status conference or, alternatively, specially setting said motion) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketOrder (By the Court granting ex parte appl. to cont. FSC/trial and related dates); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for an order shortening time ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Defendant, Superior Enterprises Llc's Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time to Immediately Hear Defendant's Motion to Continue Trial and Final Status Conference or, Alternatively, Specially Setting Said Motion; Memorandum of Points and Au); Filed by Superior Enterprises, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Cross-Complaint); Filed by Superior Enterprises, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Superior Enterprises, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Superior Enterprises, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Superior Enterprises, LLC (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Superior Enterprises, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Superior Enterprises, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Angel Paiz Garcia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Angel Paiz Garcia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****2295    Hearing Date: November 18, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ANGEL PAIZ GARCIA,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

SUPERIOR ENTERPRISES, LLC, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: ****2295

[TENTATIVE] ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 18, 2019

Plaintiff, Angel Paiz Garcia’s attorney of record, Fred Hanassab, moves to be relieved as counsel.  Counsel declares he has lost contact with Plaintiff, such that further representation is not possible.  The motion is denied without prejudice for two reasons. 

First, Counsel declares the moving papers were served on Client at an address he was unable to confirm.  Counsel declares he attempted to confirm the address via telephone and certified mail.  The Court wishes to hear from Counsel, at the hearing, concerning the results of each of these attempts.  Did Counsel receive the signed return receipt?  Did Counsel get Plaintiff’s voicemail?  Did Counsel leave a message?  Does Counsel have an e-mail address and, if so, did Counsel try to reach Plaintiff via e-mail?  Counsel must address these issues by way of an amended declaration. 

Second, if Counsel is unable to serve Plaintiff at a confirmed address, Counsel must serve the moving papers on the Clerk of the Court pursuant to CCP ;1101(b) and CRC 3.1362(d). 

Counsel is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  


Case Number: ****2295    Hearing Date: November 07, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES - CENTRAL DISTRICT

ANGEL PAIZ GARCIA,

Plaintiff(s),

vs.

SUPERIOR ENTERPRISES, LLC, ET AL.,

Defendant(s).

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

)

Case No.: ****2295

[TENTATIVE] ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS

Dept. 3

1:30 p.m.

November 7, 2019

Defendant propounded form interrogatories, RPDs, and a demand for statement of damages on Plaintiff on 92/05/19.  On 7/15/19, the Court entered an order granting Defendant’s motions to compel responses to the outstanding discovery, and also imposing sanctions; the Court ordered Plaintiff to serve verified responses within ten days.  To date, Plaintiff has not complied with the order; at this time, Defendant seeks an order imposing terminating sanctions.

Pursuant to Deyo v. Kilbourne (1978) 84 Cal.App.3d 771, 776, the Court should typically impose lesser sanctions prior to awarding terminating sanctions.  However, there are circumstances where imposition of terminating sanctions is appropriate without first imposing issue and/or evidentiary sanctions.  See Laguna Auto Body v. Farmers Ins. Exch. (1991) 231 Cal.App.3d 481, 490-91. 

Terminating sanctions are imposed at this time for three reasons.  First, the Court previously imposed monetary sanctions.  Second, a brief review of the prior motions reveals that the discovery at issue goes to the “heart” of Plaintiff’s case, and therefore an issue or evidentiary sanction would be tantamount to a terminating sanction.  Third, Plaintiff has not opposed this motion and appears to have abandoned the case. 

Plaintiff’s case against Moving Defendant is dismissed.

Defendant is ordered to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the court at sscdept3@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative as directed by the instructions provided on the court website at www.lacourt.org.  If the department does not receive an email indicating the parties are submitting on the tentative and there are no appearances at the hearing, the motion may be placed off calendar.  If a party submits on the tentative, the party’s email must include the case number and must identify the party submitting on the tentative.  


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Enterprises Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HANASSAB FRED F. ESQ.