Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/06/2020 at 06:13:45 (UTC).

ANGEL OLIFERUK VS RONI VARDI

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 ANGEL OLIFERUK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RONI VARDI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6711

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLIFERUK ANGEL

Defendant

VARDI RONI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HORNER BRENTON

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

11/10/2020: Request for Dismissal

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

10/1/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

10/1/2020: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/25/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/25/2020: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ANGEL OLIFERUK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by ANGEL OLIFERUK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by ANGEL OLIFERUK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by ANGEL OLIFERUK (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HORNER BRENTON L