This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/05/2021 at 21:46:27 (UTC).

ANGEL OCHOA VS TOYOTA MATERIAL HANDLING U.S.A., INC.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 ANGEL OCHOA filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against TOYOTA MATERIAL HANDLING U S A , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANN I. JONES, KENNETH R. FREEMAN, YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS and ELIHU M. BERLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7754

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

ANN I. JONES

KENNETH R. FREEMAN

YVETTE M. PALAZUELOS

ELIHU M. BERLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCHOA ANGEL

Defendants

TOYOTA MATERIAL HANDLING U.S.A. INC. DBA TOYOTA MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTIONS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

REBAS INC. [DOE 1] DBA TOYOTA MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HAINES PAUL K.

SCHMIDT FLETCHER W. H.

Defendant Attorneys

SMITH ANN KATHLEEN

LANGE JOSHUA NATHANIEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR ENTRY OF DEFA...)

9/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR ENTRY OF DEFA...)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

9/16/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

8/18/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF COURT ORDER

Answer - DEFENDANT REBAS, INC. DBA TOYOTA MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTIONS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ANGEL OCHOA'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

8/19/2021: Answer - DEFENDANT REBAS, INC. DBA TOYOTA MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTIONS' ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF ANGEL OCHOA'S CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSHUA N. LANGE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO NON-ANSWERING DEFENDANT REBAS

8/19/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JOSHUA N. LANGE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AS TO NON-ANSWERING DEFENDANT REBAS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING)

8/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: FILING RESPONSIVE PLEADING)

Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

8/16/2021: Clerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service

Order - ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT TOYOTA MATERIAL HANDLING U.S.A., INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE

7/8/2021: Order - ORDER DISMISSING DEFENDANT TOYOTA MATERIAL HANDLING U.S.A., INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: CRC 3.770 D...)

7/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW; STATUS CONFERENCE RE: CRC 3.770 D...)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

7/1/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RACHEL G. WEATHERLY IN SUPPORT OF ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT

7/1/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RACHEL G. WEATHERLY IN SUPPORT OF ORDER GRANTING DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW K. MOEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT

7/1/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF MATTHEW K. MOEN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT

Request - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT TOYOTA MATERIAL HANDLING U.S.A., INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE

7/1/2021: Request - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT TOYOTA MATERIAL HANDLING U.S.A., INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE

Case Management Order

6/4/2021: Case Management Order

Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

6/4/2021: Order - ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Joint Status Conference Report - PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT REBAS, INC.'S JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

5/27/2021: Joint Status Conference Report - PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT REBAS, INC.'S JOINT INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE REPORT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 06/04/2021, CMO, ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

6/4/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) OF 06/04/2021, CMO, ORDER AUTHORIZING ELECTRONIC SERVICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

6/4/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • Hearing06/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 9 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: ( Responsive Pleading Or Entry Of Default As To Non-answering Defendant Rebas) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Responsive Pleading Or Entry Of Defa...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDefendant Rebas, Inc. dba Toyota Material Handling Solutions' Answer to Plaintiff Angel Ochoa's Class Action Complaint; Filed by Toyota Material Handling U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (of Joshua N. Lange in Support of Opposition to Order to Show Cause RE: Responsive Pleading or Entry of Default as to Non-Answering Defendant Rebas); Filed by Toyota Material Handling U.S.A., Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Court Order; Filed by Angel Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 9, Yvette M. Palazuelos, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (ReFiling Responsive Pleading) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review Re: Filing Responsive Pleading)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • Docketat 4:16 PM in Department 6, Elihu M. Berle, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Nunc Pro Tunc Order) of 01/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 01/05/2021); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Angel Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Angel Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Angel Ochoa (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REBAS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where TOYOTA MATERIAL HANDLING U.S.A. INC. DBA TOYOTA MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTIONS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH ANN KATHLEEN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANGE JOSHUA N.