Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/29/2021 at 01:46:01 (UTC).

ANGEL DUVON, ET AL. VS EDGAR CHIGUA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 ANGEL DUVON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EDGAR CHIGUA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2522

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

NEPTUNE REALTY INVESTMENTS LLC

DUVON ANGEL

Defendants

CHIGUA EDGAR

BARRERA MIGUEL

EXCELLENCE RE REAL ESTATE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MILLER RICHARD T

BOWER DAVID

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

4/2/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT

Notice - NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

4/2/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF PENDING ACTION

Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

4/2/2021: Amended Complaint - AMENDED COMPLAINT (1ST)

Proof of Personal Service

4/7/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/20/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

4/20/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/16/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Substitution of Attorney

2/17/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

2/17/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Proof of Personal Service

2/8/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/21/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/21/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/21/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

1/21/2021: Complaint

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • Hearing06/24/2021 at 09:00 AM in Department 16 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Angel Duvon (Plaintiff); Neptune Realty Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Angel Duvon (Plaintiff); Neptune Realty Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Angel Duvon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Pending Action); Filed by Angel Duvon (Plaintiff); Neptune Realty Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketAmended Complaint ( (1st)); Filed by Angel Duvon (Plaintiff); Neptune Realty Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Amended Complaint); Filed by Angel Duvon (Plaintiff); Neptune Realty Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Angel Duvon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Neptune Realty Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Angel Duvon (Plaintiff); Neptune Realty Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Angel Duvon (Plaintiff); Neptune Realty Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Angel Duvon (Plaintiff); Neptune Realty Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Angel Duvon (Plaintiff); Neptune Realty Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Angel Duvon (Plaintiff); Neptune Realty Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EXCELLENCE RE REAL ESTATE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BOWER DAVID

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MILLER RICHARD T