Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2021 at 16:56:18 (UTC).

ANETTE MANOUKIAN VS ADAM MICHAEL KNOX

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 ANETTE MANOUKIAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ADAM MICHAEL KNOX. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8795

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

MANOUKIAN ANETTE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

KNOX ADAM MICHAEL DBA ADAM'S BOOTCAMP BOXING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAGOPIAN SHANT HAROUT

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

HALL TIMOTHY A

 

Court Documents

Answer

5/11/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/11/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

4/16/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer

4/6/2021: Answer

Cross-Complaint

4/6/2021: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

3/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

3/19/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER]

PI General Order

3/19/2021: PI General Order

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

3/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

3/5/2021: Complaint

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2024
  • Hearing03/01/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • Hearing09/02/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • Hearing08/19/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 31 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Adam Michael Knox (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by Adam Michael Knox (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Adam Michael Knox (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Adam Michael Knox (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Anette Manoukian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Anette Manoukian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Anette Manoukian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Anette Manoukian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAGOPIAN SHANT HAROUT