This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2023 at 05:58:21 (UTC).

ANDY WALLER VS NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC., A GEORGIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2020 ANDY WALLER filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against NORRED ASSOCIATES, INC , A GEORGIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JILL FEENEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6044

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JILL FEENEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALLER ANDY

Cross Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

NORRED & ASSOCIATES INC. A GEORGIA CORPORATION

AMERICOLD LOGISTICS LLP A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

AMERICOLD REALTY TRUST A REAL ESTATE INVESTMENT TRUST FORMED IN MARYLAND

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMASSIAN VACHE

Defendant Attorneys

MORTON RICHARD

BROWER FRANCES

Cross Defendant Attorney

GREEN IAN M.

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, #4

1/3/2023: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, #4

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC);)

12/30/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (- INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC);)

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

12/21/2022: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION

12/21/2022: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NORRED & ASSOCIATES MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

12/19/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT NORRED & ASSOCIATES MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC.S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (

9/28/2022: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC.S REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (

Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET FOUR); REQUEST FOR

9/28/2022: Separate Statement - SEPARATE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC.S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS FURTHER RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (SET FOUR); REQUEST FOR

Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

9/27/2022: Informal Discovery Conference Form for Personal Injury Courts

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

4/25/2022: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Answer

6/8/2021: Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

1/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [PI GENERAL ORDER], STANDING ORDER RE PI PROCEDURES AND HEARING DATE

PI General Order

1/6/2021: PI General Order

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

2/23/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Answer

3/5/2021: Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

3/5/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Cross-Complaint

3/22/2021: Cross-Complaint

Answer

3/22/2021: Answer

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2023
  • Hearing11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2023
  • Hearing04/07/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • Hearing03/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Hearing01/26/2023 at 3:30 PM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Hearing01/26/2023 at 3:30 PM in Department 30 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketNotice Notice of Continuance of Informal Discovery Conference and Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production, #4; Filed by: NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC., a Georgia Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 01/26/2023 at 03:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set Four; Request for Sanctions scheduled for 01/26/2023 at 03:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (- Informal Discovery Conference (IDC);)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference (IDC) scheduled for 12/30/2022 at 11:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 30 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 01/26/2023 03:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Date; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: ANDY WALLER (Plaintiff); As to: NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC., a Georgia Corporation (Defendant); AMERICOLD LOGISTICS, LLP, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); AMERICOLD REALTY TRUST a Real Estate Investment Trust formed in Maryland (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 05/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal scheduled for 11/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Daniel M. Crowley in Department 28 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: ANDY WALLER (Plaintiff); As to: NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC., a Georgia Corporation (Defendant); AMERICOLD LOGISTICS, LLP, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); AMERICOLD REALTY TRUST a Real Estate Investment Trust formed in Maryland (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: ANDY WALLER (Plaintiff); As to: NORRED & ASSOCIATES, INC., a Georgia Corporation (Defendant); AMERICOLD LOGISTICS, LLP, a Delaware Limited Liability Company (Defendant); AMERICOLD REALTY TRUST a Real Estate Investment Trust formed in Maryland (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORRED & ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICOLD LOGISTICS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMASSIAN VACHE A.