Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/04/2020 at 05:59:22 (UTC).

ANDY DOBSON VS KAMRAN HEKMAT, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 ANDY DOBSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against KAMRAN HEKMAT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUTH ANN KWAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6005

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUTH ANN KWAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DOBSON ANDY

Defendants

HEKMAT KAMRAN

K.H.P. ENTERPRISES LLC

14906 DICKENS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZASLAVSKY NEAL S

ZASLAVSKY NEAL S.

Defendant Attorneys

KALTENBACH JOHN JOSEPH

KALTENBACH JOHN J.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/30/2020: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/10/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer - ANSWER THIRD AMENDED ANSWER

9/10/2019: Answer - ANSWER THIRD AMENDED ANSWER

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME

9/25/2019: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON PEMSTEIN ESQ RE SERVICE OF VERIFIED DISCOVERY WITHOUT OBJECTIONS

11/18/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JASON PEMSTEIN ESQ RE SERVICE OF VERIFIED DISCOVERY WITHOUT OBJECTIONS

Request for Dismissal

11/25/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND R...)

12/6/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND R...)

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

12/6/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED DATES

Notice of Settlement

12/18/2019: Notice of Settlement

Answer - ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

5/31/2019: Answer - ANSWER FIRST AMENDED ANSWER TO VERIFIED COMPLAINT

Answer - Answer (First Amended)

2/25/2019: Answer - Answer (First Amended)

Case Management Statement

3/12/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Deposit - Jury

3/13/2019: Notice of Deposit - Jury

Demand for Jury Trial

1/22/2019: Demand for Jury Trial

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/4/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/26/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service of Summons

11/26/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service of Summons

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Andy Dobson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Compel (Defendant's attendance at Deposition) - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Docketat 3:48 PM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order re: notice of settlement;) of 12/18/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Settlement; Filed by Andy Dobson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: notice of settlement;)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docketat 12:00 PM in Department 72, Ruth Ann Kwan, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order re: stipulation and order to continue trial and r...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
31 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Kamran Hekmat (Defendant); 14906 Dickens, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Kamran Hekmat (Defendant); 14906 Dickens, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andy Dobson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Andy Dobson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Andy Dobson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Andy Dobson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by Andy Dobson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZASLAVSKY NEAL