This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 15:27:45 (UTC).

ANDY ATIGHI VS CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 ANDY ATIGHI filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MALCOLM MACKEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7629

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MALCOLM MACKEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATIGHI ANDY

Defendants

CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE CORPORATION

GRP FINANCIAL SERVICES CORP.

DLJ MORTGAGE

DOHERTY TIMOTHY M

NEXT BANK STATE SAVINGS BANK

WMC MORTGAGE CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/24/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

9/28/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/13/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/13/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/13/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/13/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/9/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

9/13/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/14/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/14/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

9/14/2021: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/17/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/17/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/17/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

9/2/2021: Proof of Personal Service

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • Hearing12/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 55 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Andy Atighi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Andy Atighi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Andy Atighi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Andy Atighi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Pleadings; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Andy Atighi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Andy Atighi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 55, Malcolm Mackey, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by Andy Atighi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Andy Atighi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Andy Atighi (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GRP Financial Services Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. by Caliber Home Loans Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CAL-WESTERN RECONVEYANCE LLC is a litigant