This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/21/2021 at 18:48:55 (UTC).

ANDREWS, MARK VS NUNEZ, JOE EUSUBIO

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 ANDREWS, MARK filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against NUNEZ, JOE EUSUBIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COHEN, LAURA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4283

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COHEN, LAURA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANDREWS MARK

Respondent

NUNEZ JOE EUSUBIO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

COZINE TESS MARIE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Dismissed - TRO-Lack of Prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketRemote Appearance - Scheduled; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2021
  • DocketLACourtConnect-Fees Paid; Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 94, Cohen, Laura, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Held - Continued, TRO Reissued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketStipulation - Appointment of Court Commissioner; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketRequest to Continue and Reissue TRO (Form 115); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketNotice - Hearing & Order on Reissuance TRO (Form 116); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Attorney for Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COZINE TESS MARIE