This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2023 at 13:59:07 (UTC).

ANDREW SCOTT ROBERTSON, ET AL. VS PHASE 5 ENERGY LTD., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 ANDREW SCOTT ROBERTSON, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PHASE 5 ENERGY LTD , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1683

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

ROBERTSON ANDREW SCOTT AKA SCOTT ROBERTSON AN INDIVIDUAL

SCOTT ROBERTSON DESIGN LLC

PATTON CHRISTOPHER

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

PHASE 5 ENERGY LTD.

PLOUGH PHILIP

SMART ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SACKS LEE

Defendant Attorneys

DOWNES PATRICK N.

BARRIOS BRAD F.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/18/2023: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/2/2023: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

7/14/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

7/5/2023: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

6/16/2023: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

6/16/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/8/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/08/2023

5/8/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/08/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

5/8/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Cross-Complaint

4/19/2023: Cross-Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/19/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE AMEND ANSWER AND FILE CROSS-COMPL...)

4/18/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE AMEND ANSWER AND FILE CROSS-COMPL...)

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/11/2023: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SACKS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SACKS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW SCOTT ROBERTSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

4/7/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANDREW SCOTT ROBERTSON IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

4/7/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Notice of Related Case

4/3/2023: Notice of Related Case

Request for Judicial Notice

3/22/2023: Request for Judicial Notice

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Summary Judgment scheduled for 10/31/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Andrew Scott Robertson, et al. on 08/26/2021, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Andrew Scott Robertson and Scott Robertson Design, LLC as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Andrew Scott Robertson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Dismissal: Filed By: Andrew Scott Robertson (Plaintiff); Result: Entered ; Result Date: 08/18/2023 ; As To Parties:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service of all Cross-Defendants scheduled for 10/31/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (Estimate: 5 days) scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/07/2023
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 72 - Hon. Joseph Lipnereffective 08/07/2023; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
80 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAddress for Lee Sacks (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as to ALL named defendants scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/21/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Andrew Scott Robertson (Plaintiff); Scott Robertson Design, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Phase 5 Energy Ltd., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Andrew Smart, an individual (Defendant); Philip Plough, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Andrew Scott Robertson (Plaintiff); Scott Robertson Design, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Phase 5 Energy Ltd., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Andrew Smart, an individual (Defendant); Philip Plough, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Andrew Scott Robertson (Plaintiff); Scott Robertson Design, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Phase 5 Energy Ltd., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Andrew Smart, an individual (Defendant); Philip Plough, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1683 Hearing Date: April 18, 2023 Dept: 72

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT

Date: 4/18/23 (8:30 AM)

Case: Andrew Scott Robertson et al. v. Phase 5 Energy LTD et al. (*******1683)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants Phase 5 Energy LTD, Andrew Smart, and Philip Plough’s Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint is GRANTED.

Defendants’ requests to take judicial notice are DENIED as “unnecessary to the resolution” of the issues before the Court. (Martinez v. San Diego County Credit Union (2020) 50 Cal.App.5th 1048, 1075.)

Defendants Phase 5 Energy LTD (“Phase 5”), Andrew Smart, and Philip Plough seek leave to file a Cross-Complaint against plaintiffs Scott Robertson and Scott Robertson Design, LLC, as well as Christopher Patton.

Defendants’ proposed claims are compulsory because they arise out of the operation of Phase 5, a defendant in the Complaint and a proposed cross-complainant. (See CCP 426.10(c) [“‘Related cause of action’ means a cause of action which arises out of the same transaction, occurrence, or series of transactions or occurrences as the cause of action which the plaintiff alleges in his complaint.”]; Proposed XC 1-5.) In the Complaint, plaintiffs Andrew Scott Robertson and Scott Robertson Design, LLC seek damages against Phase 5 and its officers, defendants Andrew Smart, and Philip Plough, for breach of agreements regarding their compensation, return on investments, and unpaid rent and for destruction of the value of Robertson’s shares in Phase 5 arising from the termination of Phase 5’s business. In the proposed Cross-Complaint, defendants allege that the cause of the harm alleged in the Complaint is the fault of Robertson and Patton. (Proposed XC 1, 104, 105.)

Plaintiffs oppose the motion on the ground that the proposed Cross-Complaint is duplicative of another action filed in Florida and that the Court does not have jurisdiction over Patton. In the interest of avoiding forfeiture of any causes of action, as required under CCP 426.50, plaintiffs’ contentions do not bar the filing of the Cross-Complaint. Patton may seek any relief to which he believes he is entitled after the filing of the Cross-Complaint.

Plaintiffs also contend that the Cross-Complaint is not proposed in good faith because defendants were purportedly aware of the claims against Patton since February 2021 and did not file this motion until two years later. Defendants adequately explain that, after their current counsel substituted into the action in February 2023, counsel reviewed the file and discovered the claims against plaintiffs. (Downes Decl. 2, 3.) Plaintiffs fail to show substantial evidence of bad faith that would warrant denial of the filing of the proposed Cross-Complaint. (Silver Organization, Ltd v. Frank (1990) 217 Cal.App.3d 94, 99 [“A motion to file a cross-complaint at any time during the course of the action must be granted unless bad faith of the moving party is demonstrated where forfeiture would otherwise result”].)

The motion is GRANTED. Defendants are ordered to file the Cross-Complaint as proposed in the motion within two (2) court days hereof.