This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 11:17:12 (UTC).

ANDREW SCOTT ROBERTSON, ET AL. VS PHASE 5 ENERGY LTD., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 ANDREW SCOTT ROBERTSON, filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PHASE 5 ENERGY LTD , A DELAWARE CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1683

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBERTSON ANDREW SCOTT AKA SCOTT ROBERTSON AN INDIVIDUAL

SCOTT ROBERTSON DESIGN LLC

Defendants

PHASE 5 ENERGY LTD.

PLOUGH PHILIP

SMART ANDREW

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SACKS LEE

Defendant Attorneys

BARRIOS BRAD F.

DOWNES PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LEE SACKS AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO THE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADLINES

2/27/2023: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LEE SACKS AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO THE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADLINES

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DA...)

2/27/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DA...)

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO THE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADL

2/27/2023: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO THE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADL

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

2/24/2023: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

2/24/2023: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADLINES

2/24/2023: Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADLINES

Substitution of Attorney

2/22/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

2/22/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Substitution of Attorney

2/22/2023: Substitution of Attorney

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE ADMISSION IN PRO HAC VICE

1/25/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER RE ADMISSION IN PRO HAC VICE

Order - ORDER ORDER ON ADMISSION IN PRO HAC VICE

1/24/2023: Order - ORDER ORDER ON ADMISSION IN PRO HAC VICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ...)

1/24/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE ADMITTED PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ...)

Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION IN PRO HAC VICE

12/23/2022: Application - APPLICATION APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION IN PRO HAC VICE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF G. RICHARD GREEN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF BRAD F. BARRIOS

12/23/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF G. RICHARD GREEN IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF BRAD F. BARRIOS

Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING FOR ADMISSION IN PRO HAC VICE

12/23/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING FOR ADMISSION IN PRO HAC VICE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

1/5/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

1/5/2022: Case Management Statement

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2023
  • Hearing12/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2023
  • Hearing11/27/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADLINES: Filed By: Phase 5 Energy Ltd. (Defendant),Philip Plough (Defendant),Andrew Smart (Defendant); Result: Granted ; Result Date: 02/27/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDeclaration OF LEE SACKS AND MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO THE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADLINES; Filed by: Andrew Scott Robertson (Plaintiff); Scott Robertson Design, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMemorandum of Points & Authorities SUBMITTED BY PLAINTIFFS IN OPPOSITION TO THE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER CONTINUING THE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADLINES; Filed by: Andrew Scott Robertson (Plaintiff); Scott Robertson Design, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (Estimate: 5 days) scheduled for 12/04/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/27/2023 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DA...)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application FOR ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRETRIAL DEADLINES scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 updated: Result Date to 02/27/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Jury Trial (Estimate: 5 days) scheduled for 03/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 12/04/2023 09:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAddress for Lee Sacks (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service as to ALL named defendants scheduled for 11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/21/2022 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 72

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Andrew Scott Robertson (Plaintiff); Scott Robertson Design, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Phase 5 Energy Ltd., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Andrew Smart, an individual (Defendant); Philip Plough, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Andrew Scott Robertson (Plaintiff); Scott Robertson Design, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Phase 5 Energy Ltd., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Andrew Smart, an individual (Defendant); Philip Plough, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Andrew Scott Robertson (Plaintiff); Scott Robertson Design, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Phase 5 Energy Ltd., a Delaware corporation (Defendant); Andrew Smart, an individual (Defendant); Philip Plough, an individual (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Curtis A. Kin in Department 72 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less