Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/22/2019 at 01:13:03 (UTC).

ANDREW RANKIN, ET AL VS EDWARD DAVID BRODEN, ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/17/2018 ANDREW RANKIN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EDWARD DAVID BRODEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PAUL A. BACIGALUPO and VIRGINIA KEENY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6743

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PAUL A. BACIGALUPO

VIRGINIA KEENY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RANKIN ANDREW

MARNIE EVA

Defendants, Not Classified By Court and Cross Defendants

EDB CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT INC.

DOES 1 TO 100

BRODEN EDWARD DAVID

EDB CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT

TOTAL KITCHEN REMODELING

ALL PLASTER SYSTEMS INC.

BRADLEY ELECTRIC

ARCH N' TECH

MICRO-CHEM COATINGS

SCOTT MUMFORD HEATING AND AIR

DALE CANFIELD CONSTRUCTION INC.

PIRRO LANDSCAPE AND MASONRY INC.

HOLLYWOOD GLASS CO. INC.

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Not Classified By Court

BRODEN EDWARD DAVID

NATIONAL DECK AND STAIR

SMITH BROS INC.

PIRRO LANDSCAPE AND MASONRY INC.

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MOES 1 TO 500

TOTAL KITCHEN REMODELING

TOWN AND COUNTRY CONSTRUCTION CO

ALL PLASTER SYSTEMS INC.

NATIONAL DECK AND STAIR

BRADLEY ELECTRIC

ARCH N' TECH

MICRO-CHEM COATINGS

SCOTT MUMFORD HEATING AND AIR

SMITH BROS INC.

MOES 1 TO 100

DALE CANFIELD CONSTRUCTION INC.

PIRRO LANDSCAPE AND MASONRY INC.

HOLLYWOOD GLASS CO. INC.

Defendants and Not Classified By Court

EDB CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT INC.

BRODEN EDWARD DAVID

EDB CONSTRUCTION MANAGEMENT

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

USHER ULRIC ERWIN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

RHODES BRIAN WESLEY

WATKINS MICHELLE

Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

WATKINS MICHELLE

WYMAN SAMUEL A.

LEE TED M.

JEFFERY MONA

DAVILA NICHOLAS

STRONG DAVID LEE

MILANI ANTHONY

MCNALLY BRYAN

ORLAND JAMES

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND TO ALLOW CROSS-DEFENDANT BRADLEY ELECTRIC TO FILE AN ANSWER

9/16/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND TO ALLOW CROSS-DEFENDANT BRADLEY ELECTRIC TO FILE AN ANSWER

Answer

7/23/2019: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

6/25/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT

Answer

7/2/2019: Answer

Cross-Complaint

7/8/2019: Cross-Complaint

Answer

6/13/2019: Answer

Answer

6/3/2019: Answer

Case Management Statement

6/6/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

6/6/2019: Case Management Statement

Answer

3/20/2019: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

3/20/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/22/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

3/22/2019: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Case Management Statement

11/27/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/28/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00

6/13/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-06-13 00:00:00

Answer -

9/10/2018: Answer -

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • Hearing01/29/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department W at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Trial Setting Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by NATIONAL DECK AND STAIR (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department W, Virginia Keeny, Presiding; Post-Mediation Status Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Bradley Electric, an unknown California organization (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (to Set Aside Default and to Allow Cross-Defendant Bradley Electric to File an Answer); Filed by Bradley Electric, an unknown California organization (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Town & Country Construction Company (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint (First Amended Complaint); Filed by Eva Marnie (Plaintiff); Andrew Rankin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
90 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCross-Comp Filed-Summons Issued; Filed by MOES 1 TO 500 (Cross-Defendant); Edward David Broden (Legacy Party); EDB Construction Management (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Edward David Broden (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Edward David Broden (Legacy Party); EDB Construction Management (Legacy Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketSummons (Cross-Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Eva Marnie (Plaintiff); Andrew Rankin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons and Complaint; Filed by Eva Marnie (Plaintiff); Andrew Rankin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Eva Marnie (Plaintiff); Andrew Rankin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Eva Marnie (Plaintiff); Andrew Rankin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Eva Marnie (Plaintiff); Andrew Rankin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITH BROS INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where DALE CANFIELD CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCNALLY BRYAN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATKINS MICHELLE